EP2364823 - Robot system and transfer method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irie, Toshimitsu Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 02 /
Murai, Shinji Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/37] | 01 /
Irie, Toshimitsu Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
Murai, Shinji Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/37] | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11150319.9 | 06.01.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | JP20100054015 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010054015 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364823 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2364823 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364823 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
B25J9/1687 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37555 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39508 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40053 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40613 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2011/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Robotersystem und Transferverfahren | [2016/11] | English: | Robot system and transfer method | [2011/37] | French: | Système robotique et procédé de transfert | [2016/07] |
Former [2011/37] | Robotersystem und Übertragungsverfahren | ||
Former [2011/37] | Système de robot et procédé de transfert | Examination procedure | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 17.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2011 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | GB | 06.01.2017 | IE | 06.01.2017 | LU | 06.01.2017 | MT | 06.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
MT | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
MT | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
MT | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
MT | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
MT | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
MT | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US4402053 (KELLEY ROBERT B [US], et al) [I] 1,9 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 55 * * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 28 * * column 7, lines 1-28 * * column 10, line 12 - column 14, line 44 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2-8,10; | [Y]EP1442848 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4,6,10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1,3,4,6,7 *; | [Y]EP1589483 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4,10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 2,6,7 *; | [Y]JP2001277167 (OKAYAMA PREF GOV SHIN GIJUTSU) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 10,11 *; | [Y]WO2010024796 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [Y] 7,8 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 15 * * page 17, line 21 - page 23, line 11 * * figures 16-18 *; | [Y]JP2000263480 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 4,7 *; | [A]DE102008025857 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,9,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2010054015 | JP2009128201 |