EP2388616 - Display system and method of ultrasound apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon do / KR | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Sung Yoon 103-1202, Woosung Apt., Dogok-ri, Wabu-eup Namyangju Si Gyeonggi-do 472-735 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Kwang Hee 3-1101, Cheongsol Apt., Seo-gu Daejeion 302-743 / KR | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11150633.3 | 11.01.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | KR20100046041 | 17.05.2010 Original published format: KR 20100046041 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388616 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388616 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, A61B8/08, A61B5/107 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
G01S7/52074 (EP,US);
A61B5/1075 (EP,US);
A61B8/0866 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B8/466 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | G01S7/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigesystem und Verfahren für ein Ultraschallgerät | [2011/47] | English: | Display system and method of ultrasound apparatus | [2011/47] | French: | Système d'affichage et procédé pour appareil à ultrasons | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 16.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/34] | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007081705 (CARNEIRO GUSTAVO [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [ 55 ] - [0 57] *; | [XYI]US2008188748 (SONEK JIRI D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-11,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] , [0 23] * [Y] 7,8,15 [I] 4,5,12,13; | [XYI] - CHUNG B L ET AL, "The application of three-dimensional ultrasound to nuchal translucency measurement in early pregnancy (10-14 weeks): a preliminary study", vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1046/J.1469-0705.2000.00052.X, ISSN 0960-7692, (20000201), pages 122 - 125, ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1046/j.1469-0705.2000.00052.x/pdf, (20101201), XP002612511 [X] 1-3,6,9-11,14 * abstract * * page 122, column rh, line 35 - page 123, column lh, line 10 * * page 123, column rh, line 3 - page 124, column lh, line 6 * [Y] 7,8,15 [I] 4,5,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1469-0705.2000.00052.x | by applicant | KR20100046041 |