EP2306512 - Heat radiator and power module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | |||
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otoshi, Kota KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | 02 /
Kono, Eiji KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | 03 /
Toh, Keiji KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Katsufumi KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | 05 /
Furukawa, Yuichi SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | 06 /
Yamauchi, Shinobu SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | 07 /
Hoshino, Ryoichi SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | 08 /
Wakabayashi, Nobuhiro 2-24, Jyouhoku 5-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 329-0029 / JP | 09 /
Nakagawa, Shintaro SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | [2014/36] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Otoshi, Kota KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | ||
02 /
Kono, Eiji KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | |||
03 /
Toh, Keiji KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Katsufumi KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | |||
05 /
Furukawa, Yuichi SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamauchi, Shinobu SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
07 /
Hoshino, Ryoichi SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
08 /
Wakabayashi, Nobuhiro 2-24, Jyouhoku 5-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 329-0029 / JP | |||
09 /
Nakagawa, Shintaro SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Otoshi, Kota KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | ||
02 /
Kono, Eiji KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | |||
03 /
Toh, Keiji KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Katsufumi KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 4488671 / JP | |||
05 /
Furukawa, Yuichi SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamauchi, Shinobu SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
07 /
Hoshino, Ryoichi SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
08 /
Wakabayashi, Nobuhiro SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | |||
09 /
Nakagawa, Shintaro SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Oyama Regional office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 3238678 / JP | Representative(s) | Boura, Olivier, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Boura, Olivier, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11150797.6 | 05.07.2006 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | JP20050198288 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005198288 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2306512 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2306512 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306512 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/36, H01L23/367, H01L23/373, H01L23/473, H05K1/02, H05K3/34, H05K3/00, H05K1/03 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
H05K3/0061 (EP,US);
H01L23/36 (KR);
H01L23/367 (EP,US);
H01L23/3677 (EP,US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H05K3/341 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0373 (EP,US);
H05K2201/1028 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0405 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | H01L23/36, H05K1/02, H01L23/367, H01L23/473, H05K3/00, H05K3/34 | ||
Former IPC [2011/14] | H01L23/36, H05K1/02, H01L23/367 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Kühlkörper und Leistungsmodul | [2014/10] | English: | Heat radiator and power module | [2011/14] | French: | Dissipateur de chaleur et modul à haute prestation | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/14] | Kühlkörper und Leitungsmodul | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06767882.1 / EP1901350 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060767882) is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2006 | AT | 03.09.2014 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10337640 (SEMIKRON ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure - * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]US6138748 (HAMBURGEN WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 2 - line 54 *; | [A]JPH03253063 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]JP2003017627 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | JP2004153075 |