EP2348364 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Hiroki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11151340.4 | 19.01.2011 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | JP20100012964 | 25.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010012964 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348364 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2348364 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G03G21/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
G03G21/0011 (EP,US);
G03G15/50 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00118 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1627 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2011/30] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2011/30] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [2011/30] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007171395 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2007286636 (INADA YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]JP2009282487 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2009324279 (MIYAHARA KENSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0125]; figure 9 * | by applicant | JP2006235563 | JP2010012964 |