EP2312360 - Composite cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Kongsberg Subsea AS P.O. Box 1012 3601 Kongsberg / NO | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states FMC Kongsberg Subsea AS P.O. Box 1012 3601 Kongsberg / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlsen, Hans-Paul Heddalsvegen 554 3677, Notodden / NO | 02 /
Inderberg, Olav Veungsdalsveien 99 3615, Kongsberg / NO | 03 /
Bendixen, Christian Ellingsrudveien 23 1400 Ski / NO | 04 /
Grønvold, Eirik Ellingsrudvn. 123 1400, Ski / NO | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Carlsen, Hans-Paul Heddalsvegen 554 3677, Notodden / NO | ||
02 /
Inderberg, Olav Veungsdalsveien 99 3615, Kongsberg / NO | |||
03 /
Bendixen, Christian Ellingsrudveien 23 1400 Ski / NO | |||
04 /
Grønvold, Eirik Ellingsrudvn. 123 1400, Ski / NO | |||
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Carlsen, Hans-Paul Heddalsvegen 554 3677, Notodden / NO | ||
02 /
Inderberg, Olav Veungsdalsveien 99 3615, Kongsberg / NO | |||
03 /
Bendixen, Christian Sandsværsveien 101a 3616, Kongsberg / NO | |||
04 /
Grønvold, Eirik Ellingsrudvn. 123 1400, Ski / NO | Representative(s) | Langan, Hans Onsagers Ltd C/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/16] | Langan, Hans Onsagers Ltd C/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11151810.6 | 18.07.2008 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | NO20070003832 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: NO 20073832 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2312360 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2312360 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, H01B7/18, H01B13/24, B29C70/20, B29C70/52, B29C70/70, B29C70/88, // H01B7/04, H01B7/36, B29L31/34 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
B29C70/20 (EP,US);
H01B13/0023 (US);
B29C70/521 (EP,US);
B29C70/70 (EP,US);
B29C70/885 (EP,US);
H01B13/24 (EP,US);
H01B7/183 (EP,US);
B29K2707/04 (EP,US);
B29K2709/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | G02B6/44, H01B7/18, H01B13/24, B29C70/20, B29C70/52, B29C70/70, B29C70/88, // H01B7/04, H01B7/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Verbundkabel | [2011/16] | English: | Composite cable | [2011/16] | French: | Câble composite | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 21.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08793884.1 / EP2176698 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080793884) is 24.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2008 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | HR | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | HR | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | HR | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB620857 (TELEGRAPH CONSTR & MAINTENANCE, et al) [A] 1,12 * page 1, line 9 - line 24 * * page 1, line 45 - line 52 *; | [A]US4239335 (STILES KENNETH M [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 6, line 16 - line 20; figures 2,3 * * column 4, line 20 - line 21 *; | [A]GB2172079 (PEARPOINT LTD) [A] 1,12,13 * page 1, line 38 - line 52 * * page 2, line 1 - line 21; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4725453 (NAKASONE TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 4, line 10 - line 14; figure 2 * * column 1, line 66 - line 68 *; | [A]US5234058 (SAS-JAWORSKY ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1,12,13 * column 2, line 50 - line 61; figure 1a *; | [A]WO02101760 (WILEMON JERRY W [US], et al) [A] 1,12,13 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 2 * * page 11, line 5 - line 10 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 11 * * page 1, line 5 - line 7 *; | [A]US6843321 (CARLSEN HANS-PAUL [NO]) [A] 1,12,13 * column 1, line 14 - line 16 ** column 5, line 5 - line 45; figures 1,4 *; | [XA]WO2006054092 (EXPRO NORTH SEA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 12 * page 8, line 7 - page 7, line 22 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 2 * * figures 1,10 * * page 4, line 30 - line 31 * [A] 1,13 | by applicant | US6600108 | US6843321 | US2006045442 | WO2006054092 |