EP2316269 - Knotting system for a dough strand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritsch GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 27- 31 97348 Markt Einersheim / DE | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhardt, Udo Fritsch GmbH Ringsbühlweg 21 97346, Iphofen / DE | [2019/24] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Bernhardt, Udo Fritsch GmbH Ringsbühlweg 21 97346, Iphofen / DE | Representative(s) | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 35 45 90017 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/24] |
Former [2011/18] | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Konigstrasse 70/Am Literaturhaus Postfach 35 45 90017 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11152235.5 | 10.01.2005 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | DE20041001792 | 12.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004001792 | [2011/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2316269 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2316269 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2316269 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A21C3/08 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
A21C3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2019/24] |
Former [2011/18] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Teigstrang-Schlingsystem | [2011/18] | English: | Knotting system for a dough strand | [2011/18] | French: | Système d'enroulement de tronçon de pâte | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05701472.2 / EP1703796 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050701472) is 11.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]DE1782289 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [YD] 1-6,10-15 * page 2, lines 1-7 * * page 3, lines 6-14 * * page 6, lines 12-21; figure - * [A] 7-9; | [A]US5494428 (PILLER OSWALD [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE4430172 (OKU AUTOMATIK OTTO KURZ GMBH & [DE]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US5955118 (POWELL GARY J [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XY]WO0160164 (FRITSCH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 7-9 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 28 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 14 * [Y] 1-6,10-15 | by applicant | DE1782289 | DE3841395 | DE4336329 | DE4441301 | DE19511409 | EP1255441 |