EP2353983 - Bicycle fitting apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elgevnick LLC 38829 Bunting Avenue, Unit 1 Fenwick Island, DE 19944 / US | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demajistre, Robert 38829 Bunting Avenue, Unit 1 Fenwick Island, DE 19944 / US | 02 /
Danahy, Kevin 5 Southwood Shores Rehoboth Beach, DE 19971 / US | 03 /
Grimm, Michael 622 Golf Course Road Altoona, PA 16601 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Elkiner, Kaya, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Elkiner, Kaya, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 11152516.8 | 28.01.2011 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | US20100299606P | 29.01.2010 Original published format: US 299606 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353983 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62K3/00 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B62J99/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrradmontagevorrichtung und Verfahren | [2011/32] | English: | Bicycle fitting apparatus and method | [2011/32] | French: | Appareil d'adaptation de bicyclette et procédé | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 22.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1410984 (BUZZI EMILIO LUIGI [IT]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007038692 (TOLL STEVEN G [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0079]; figure - *; | [Y]US2007099768 (COMAIR CLAUDE B [US], et al) [Y] 8-11 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2008058170 (GIANNASCOLI ANTONIO [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8-11 [I] 4,13; | [E]US2011077125 (KENYON TODD N [US]) [E] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | US20060612996 |