EP2481918 - Method for operating a wind farm in a RADAR neighbourhood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordex Energy GmbH Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE | [2013/13] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Nordex Energy GmbH Erich-Schlesinger-Str. 50 18059 Rostock / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinmetz, Guillaume 4 Rue du Capitaine Alfred Dreyfus 93210 La Plaine Saint-Denis / FR | 02 /
Harms, Ulrich Jaspersdiek 31 22399 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Arlt, Volker Kornblumenweg 9 27299 Langwedel / DE | 04 /
Hose, Gerd Birkenweg 40 24211 Preetz / DE | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2012/31] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11152546.5 | 28.01.2011 | [2012/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481918 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2481918 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
F03D7/0204 (EP,US);
F05B2260/99 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2012/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Windenergieanlage in einem Radarwirkungsbereich | [2012/31] | English: | Method for operating a wind farm in a RADAR neighbourhood | [2012/31] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'une éolienne dans un lieu d'effet du RADAR | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | RS | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | AT | 28.01.2016 | LU | 28.01.2016 | BE | 31.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
AT | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
AT | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
AT | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
AT | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2009202347 (RUGGER DAVID A [US]) [I] 1-6,10-13 * paragraphs [0025] - [0035] - [0040] - [0045]; figures 2A,2B * [A] 7,8,14,15 [Y] 9; | [Y]US7302903 (BEHRENS RUDOLPH [US]) [Y] 9 * page 5, lines 33-34 *; | [XDA]WO2009144435 (CAMBRIDGE CONSULTANTS [GB], et al) [XD] 14,15 * pages 1-3; figures 9,18 * [A] 1-13; | [XA]WO2010099773 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 14,15 * pages 1-3,10 * [A] 1-13; | [T] - CIVIL AVIATION AUTHORITY, "CAA Policy and Guidelines on Wind Turbines", INTERNET CITATION, ISBN 978-0-11-792406-2, (20060701), pages 1 - 66, URL: http://www.caa.co.uk/docs/33/Cap764.pdf, (20110704), XP007918986 [T] 1-15 | [T] - DEPARTMENT OF TRADE AND INDUSTRY, "FEASIBILITY OF MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF WINDFARMS ON PRIMARY RADAR", INTERNET CITATION, (20030101), pages 1 - 71, URL: http://www.bwea.com/aviation/ams_report.html, (20110704), XP007918988 [T] 1-15 | Examination | DE2737767 | US4449889 | GB2002459 | US2484291 | WO2010098814 | by applicant | WO2010122350 | WO2010109174 | WO2010099773 |