EP2481833 - Apparatus for atomic layer deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vermeer, Adrianus Johannes Petrus Maria Haagdoom 3 5666 BW Geldrop / NL | 02 /
Wit, Coen c/o TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | 03 /
Gortzen, Roger M.W. c/o Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11152805.5 | 31.01.2011 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481833 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/458, C23C16/54, C23C16/455, B65G51/03 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
C23C16/45551 (EP,US);
C23C16/458 (EP,KR,US);
B05C5/02 (US);
B65G51/03 (KR);
C23C16/455 (KR);
C23C16/54 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Atomschichtablagerung | [2012/31] | English: | Apparatus for atomic layer deposition | [2012/31] | French: | Appareil pour le dépôt de couches atomiques | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US2009081885 (LEVY DAVID H [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [0142] , [ 145]; figures 1, 16 * [Y] 2,4,5 [I] 8,10,11; | [XI]US2009291209 (GRANNEMAN ERNST H A [NL], et al) [X] 1,6,7,12-14 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0031] * [I] 8,10,11,15; | [IY]EP2159304 (TNO [NL]) [I] 2 * paragraph [0067]; figure 6 * [Y] 2,4,5 | by applicant | WO2008085474 | US2009081885 |