EP2341510 - Blockcopolymer solid electrolyte, ion-conductive membrane and process for producing the blockcopolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muramoto, Hiroo c/o R & D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co.,Ltd 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | 02 /
Niitani, Takeshi c/o R & D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co.,Ltd 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | 03 /
Aoyagi, Koichiro c/o R & D Laboratory for High-Performance Materials Nippon Soda Co.,Ltd 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Muramoto, Hiroo R & D Laboratory for High-Perf. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | ||
02 /
Niitani, Takeshi R & D Laboratory for High-Perf. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | |||
03 /
Aoyagi, Koichiro R & D Laboratory for High-Perf. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | Representative(s) | Duncan, Garreth Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/27] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11153102.6 | 23.01.2004 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | JP20030321155 | 12.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003321155 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341510 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2341510 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/06, C08L33/14, C08L53/00, C08F297/00, H01M6/18, H01M4/60, C08F290/06, C08J5/22, H01B1/12, H01M10/0565 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
C08J5/2231 (EP,US);
C08F290/06 (KR);
C08F290/062 (EP,US);
H01B1/06 (KR);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M4/60 (KR);
C08J2325/08 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | H01B1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | AL | 17.02.2011 | LT | 17.02.2011 | LV | 17.02.2011 | MK | 17.02.2011 | Title | German: | Feststoff-Blockcopolymerelektrolyt, ionenleitfähige Membran und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Blockcopolymers | [2011/27] | English: | Blockcopolymer solid electrolyte, ion-conductive membrane and process for producing the blockcopolymer | [2011/27] | French: | Electrolyte solide bloc-copolymère, membrane conductrice d'ions et procédé pur la production du bloc-copolymère. | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 19.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04704735.2 / EP1667168 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040704735) is 09.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2004 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | IE | 23.01.2013 | LU | 23.01.2013 | BG | 31.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 31.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1553117 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP]) [E] 1-10 * paragraph [0035]; example 4; claims 1-29 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] *; | [I]WO0005774 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [I] 1-9 * examples 1,2; claims 1-42 *; | [A]JPH11240998 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO0146280 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-3; claims 5,9,24; table 1 * | by applicant | JP2002216845 | JP2001181352 | JPH01240998 |