EP2364757 - Method and device for remote control of a drone, in particular a rotary-wing drone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seydoux, Henri 99 rue de Courcelles 75017, PARIS / FR | 02 /
D'Haeyer, Frédéric 16 rue du Révérend Père Chaillet Bat. D 77500, CHELLES / FR | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/37] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11153172.9 | 03.02.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | FR20100051751 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1051751 | FR20100054449 | 07.06.2010 Original published format: FR 1054449 | [2011/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364757 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364757 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A63H30/04, A63H27/133, G08C17/02, G06F3/041, // A63F9/24, A63F13/10 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
A63H30/04 (EP,US);
A63H27/12 (EP,US);
G05D1/0016 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Fernbedienung einer Drohne, insbesondere einer Drohne mit Drehflügeln | [2011/37] | English: | Method and device for remote control of a drone, in particular a rotary-wing drone | [2011/37] | French: | Procédé et appareil de télécommande d'un drone, notamment d'un drone à voilure tournante | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 22.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2011 | AL | 09.05.2012 | AT | 09.05.2012 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | HR | 09.05.2012 | IT | 09.05.2012 | LT | 09.05.2012 | LV | 09.05.2012 | MK | 09.05.2012 | MT | 09.05.2012 | PL | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | RS | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | SM | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | NO | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | ES | 20.08.2012 | IS | 09.09.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | IE | 03.02.2013 | LU | 03.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
RS | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 09.05.2012 | |
NO | 09.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005048918 (FROST HARLIE D [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * page 19; figure - *; | [A]EP1621238 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0033] , [0054] , [0057] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraphs [0085] , [0103] , [0112] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0124]; figures 7-12 *; | [A]US2006226298 (PIERSON MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-5,19,20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0039] , [0044] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0056] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figure - *; | [A]US2007077541 (CHAMPAGNE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]FR2903024 (FRANCHI MARC [FR]) [A] 1,14* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2009109711 (PARROT [FR], et al) [AD] 1-20 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 14 * * page 10 - page 11, line 15 * * page 15, line 10 - line 17; claims 2,6 * | by applicant | EP1621238 | US2007077541 | WO2009109711 |