EP2357493 - Method and device for authenticating a trajectory calculated according to radiolocation signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubrak, Damien 13 rue Mondran 31400 Toulouse / FR | [2012/36] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Kubrak, Damien 13 rue Mondran 31400 Toulouse / FR | Representative(s) | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/33] | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11153219.8 | 03.02.2011 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | FR20100000588 | 12.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1000588 | [2011/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357493 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2357493 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/21, G01S19/49 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
G01S19/21 (EP);
G01S19/49 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Authentifizierung einer Trajektorie, die mit Hilfe von Funklokalisierungssignalen berechnet wird | [2012/16] | English: | Method and device for authenticating a trajectory calculated according to radiolocation signals | [2011/33] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'authentification d'une trajectoire calculée à partir de signaux de radiolocalisation | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/33] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Authentifizierung einer Flugbahn, die mit Hilfe von Funklokalisierungssignalen berechnet wird | Examination procedure | 16.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2011 | AL | 05.09.2012 | AT | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | RS | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | IE | 03.02.2013 | LU | 03.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
RS | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5416712 (GEIER GEORGE J [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US2007194984 (WAID JAMES D [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2007247362 (STRACHAN VICTOR F [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 7, lines 19-28; figure 3 *; | [X] - JON S WARNER ET AL, "GPS Spoofing Countermeasures", INTERNET CITATION, (20031201), URL: http://www.homelandsecurity.org/bulletin/dual%20benefit/warner_gps_spoofing.html, (20100813), XP007914429 [X] 1-13 * Section 7; page 6, lines 16-25 * | by applicant | EP0904551 | FR2921528 |