EP2335566 - Compound metal analyte sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iSense Corporation 27700SW 95th Avenue Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ward, Kenneth W 10575 NW Skyline Blvd. Portland, OR 97231 / US | 02 /
Sass, Richard 02000 Palatine Hill Road Portland, OR 97219 / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11153393.1 | 16.06.2004 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335566 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N27/333, C12Q1/00 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP);
A61B5/14542 (EP);
A61B5/14865 (EP);
A61B2562/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetzter metallischer Analytsensor | [2011/25] | English: | Compound metal analyte sensor | [2011/25] | French: | Capteur d'analytes métalliques composés | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 23.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/14] | 14.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04776794.2 / EP1765148 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040776794) is 06.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6501976 (SOHRAB BORZU [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, lines 14-25 * * column 7, line 27 - column 8, line 59 *; | [X]US3436329 (KAHN ALAN R, et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, lines 13-22 * * column 2, lines 36-55 * * column 3, lines 28-31 * * column 4, lines 19-29 * * column 4, lines 37-40 *; | [E]WO2004063718 (ISENSE DEV CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004088275 (SORENSON MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [E] 1-3,5,7,9-12 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 11, lines 30-31 * * page 12, lines 1-3, 13-16 * * page 15, lines 1-17 *; | [A]US5165407 (WILSON GEORGE S [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 37 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 39 * | [X] - BURMEISTER J J ET AL, "Ceramic-based multisite microelectrode arrays for in vivo electrochemical recordings of glutamate and other neurochemicals", TRAC, TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030901), vol. 22, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0165-9936(03)00904-X, ISSN 0165-9936, pages 498 - 502, XP004480047 [X] 1-3,6-12 * abstract * * page 499, column lh, paragraph 2 - page 500, column rh, paragraph 1 * * page 501, column rh, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-9936(03)00904-X | by applicant | US5428123 | US5589563 | US5756632 |