EP2368914 - Anti-5T4 antibodies and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boghaert, Erwin, R. 93 Ludlam Road Monroe, NY 10950 / US | 02 /
Damle, Nitin, K. 53 Stevenson Lane Upper Saddle River, NJ 07458 / US | 03 /
Hamann, Philip, Ross 9 Jacobs Road Thiells, NY 10984 / US | 04 /
Khandke, Kiran 120 Eant Allison Avenue Nanuet, NY 10954 / US | 05 /
Kunz, Arthur 11 Jennifer Drive New City, NY 10956 / US | 06 /
Marquette, Kimberly, A. 66 Springfield Street Apt. 1 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 07 /
Tchistiakova, Lioudmile 19 Abbot Bridge Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 08 /
Gill, Davinder 20 Charlotte Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 09 /
Sreekumar, Kodangattil, Raman 140 Parker Road Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/39] | Porter, Jonathan Philip Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11154157.9 | 09.03.2007 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | US20060781346P | 10.03.2006 Original published format: US 781346 P | US20070891248P | 23.02.2007 Original published format: US 891248 P | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368914 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2368914 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, A61K39/395, C07K14/47 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (KR);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K51/1027 (US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C07K14/82 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/32 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/77 (US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2011/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antikörper gegen 5T4 und Anwendungen davon | [2011/39] | English: | Anti-5T4 antibodies and uses thereof | [2011/39] | French: | Anticorps anti-5T4 et leurs utilisations | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2016 | Observations by third parties | 14.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2017 | Observations by third parties | 07.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2018 | Observations by third parties | 23.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07758256.7 / EP1994055 | Divisional application(s) | EP18213944.4 / EP3539989 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070758256) is 12.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL Opponent's representative 't Hoen-van der Hoogt, Cornelia Catharina, et al, et al Byondis B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL Opponent's representative 't Hoen-van der Hoogt, Cornelia Catharina, et al, et al Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V. IP Research P.O. BOX 7071 6503 GN Nijmegen / NL | 15.10.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.01.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.02.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2007 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | LU | 09.03.2019 | MT | 09.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.03.2007 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
MT | 09.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
MT | 09.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
PT | 02.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03038098 (OXFORD BIOMEDICA LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-16 * page 2, line 11 - page 9, line 4 * * example -; claim - *; | [IP]WO2006031653 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [IP] 1-16 * page 1, line 7 - line 11 * * page 4, line 10 - line 26 ** example -; claim - *; | [IP]WO2006042158 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [IP] 1-16 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 17 * * page 8, line 9 - line 17 * * page 18, line 16 - page 29, line 25 * * page 25, line 26 - page 26, line 16 * * example 3; claim - *; | [I] - MYERS K A ET AL, "TARGETING IMMUNE EFFECTOR MOLECULES TO HUMAN TUMOR CELLS THROUGH GENETIC DELIVERY OF 5T4-SPECIFIC SCFV FUSION PROTEINS", CANCER GENE THERAPY, NORWALK, CT, US, (200211), vol. 9, no. 11, ISSN 0929-1903, pages 884 - 896, XP009007160 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.cgt.7700513 | [I] - FORSBERG G ET AL, "THERAPY OF HUMAN NON-SMALL-CELL LUNG CARCINOMA USING ANTIBODY TARGETING OF A MODIFIED SUPERANTIGEN", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, LONDON, GB, (20010706), vol. 85, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 129 - 136, XP001145660 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/bjoc.2001.1891 | [I] - SHAW A D M ET AL, "Isolation of a high affinity scFv from a monoclonal antibody recognising the oncofoetal antigen 5T4", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20001215), vol. 1524, no. 2-3, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 238 - 246, XP004275928 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(00)00165-3 | [I] - SHAW DAVID M ET AL, "Glycosylation and epitope mapping of the 5T4 glycoprotein oncofoetal antigen", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20020401), vol. 363, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 137 - 145, XP002444306 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3630137 | [I] - FORSBERG G\RAN ET AL, "Identification of framework residues in a secreted recombinant antibody fragment that control production level and localization in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC., BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19970509), vol. 272, no. 19, doi:10.1074/JBC.272.19.12430, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 12430 - 12436, XP002389356 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.19.12430 | [I] - HOLE N ET AL, "A 72KD TROPHOBLAST GLYCOPROTEIN DEFINED BY A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1988), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 239 - 246, XP002653671 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * | [I] - HOLE N ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF 5T4 A TUMOR-ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1990), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 179 - 184, XP002653672 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - MYERS K A ET AL, "ISOLATION OF A CDNA ENCODING 5T4 ONCOFETAL TROPHOBLAST GLYCOPROTEIN", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19940325), vol. 269, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9319 - 9324, XP002064468 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - WOODS ANDREW M ET AL, "Characterization of the murine 5T4 oncofoetal antigen: A target for immunotherapy in cancer", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20020815), vol. 366, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 353 - 365, XP002341798 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | US4196265 | US4671958 | WO8907947 | US4946778 | US4970198 | WO9109967 | US5037651 | US5053394 | US5079233 | US5091513 | US5108912 | US5132405 | US5260203 | US5606040 | US5648095 | US5677427 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5739277 | US5739116 | US5770710 | US5773001 | WO9855607 | US5869053 | US5877296 | US5892019 | US5952329 | US5985279 | US6024938 | US6054561 | US6309633 | US6310185 | EP1152060 | EP1160323 | GB2370571 | US6461603 | WO02096948 | US2002197262 | US2003018004 | US2003017534 | US2003032995 | GB2378704 | US2003040606 | US2004082764 | US2006002942 | WO2006031653 | - REFF ET AL., CANCER CONTROL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 152 - 66 | - SIEVERS, CANCER CHEMOTHER. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 46, pages 18 - 22 | - GOLDENBERG, CRIT. REV. ONCOL. HEMATOL., (2001), vol. 39, pages 195 - 201 | - SIEVERS ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 93, pages 3678 - 84 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 5 | - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 33 | - NEWMAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 1455 - 60 | - GREEN ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1994), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 97 | - MAGDELENAT, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1992), vol. 150, pages 133 - 43 | - HOLE ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1988), vol. 57, pages 239 - 46 | - HOLE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 45, pages 179 - 84 | - MYERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 9319 - 24 | - SOUTHALL ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 61, pages 89 - 95 | - MIEKE ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1923 - 1930 | - STARZYNSKA ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 69, pages 899 - 902 | - STARZYNSKA ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1992), vol. 66, pages 867 - 869 | - JONES ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 61, pages 96 - 100 | - CONNOR; STERN, INT. J. CANCER, vol. 46, pages 1029 - 1034 | - ALI ET AL., ORAL ONCOLOGY, (2001), vol. 37, pages 57 - 64 | - MULDER ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1923 - 30 | - NAGANUMA ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., (2002), vol. 22, pages 1033 - 1038 | - STARZYNSKA ET AL., EUR. J. GASTROENTEROL. HEPATOL., (1998), vol. 10, pages 479 - 484 | - WRIGLEY ET AL., INT. J. GYNECOL. CANCER, (1995), vol. 5, pages 269 - 274 | - SHAW ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2002), vol. 363, pages 137 - 45 | - WOODS ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2002), vol. 366, pages 353 - 65 | - MYERS ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (2002), vol. 9, pages 884 - 896 | - SHAW ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2000), vol. 1524, pages 238 - 246 | - FORSBERG ET AL., J. CANCER, (2001), vol. 85, pages 129 - 136 | - CHENG ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2004), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 602 - 9 | - MULRYAN ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER., (2002), vol. 1, pages 1129 - 37 | - MYERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 12, pages 9319 - 9324 | - HOLE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 45, pages 179 - 184 | - BENINCOSA ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2000), vol. 292, pages 810 - 6 | - KALOFONOS ET AL., EUR. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 30A, pages 1842 - 50 | - SUBRAMANIAN ET AL., PEDIATR. INFECT. DIS. J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 110 - 5 | - MARTIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9268 - 9272 | - MARTIN ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1991), vol. 203, pages 121 - 153 | - PEDERSEN ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1992), vol. 1, page 126 | - REES ET AL., Protein Structure Prediction, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1996), pages 141 - 172 | - PADLAN ET AL., FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 133 - 139 | - PADLAN, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 489 - 98 | - PADLAN ET AL., FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 133 - 9 | - FORSBERG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 19, pages 124430 - 12436 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 5 | - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 30 | - ANGAL ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 30, pages 105 - 108 | - YANG ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 254, pages 392 - 403 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LOW ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 260, pages 359 - 368 | - PATTEN ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 724 - 733 | - THOMPSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 256, pages 77 - 88 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291 | - POTTER ET AL., INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 10, no. 2-3, pages 103 - 112 | - HOUDEBINE, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 625 - 629 | - SCHILLBERG ET AL., CELL MOL. LIFE SCI., (2003), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 433 - 45 | - TIJSSEN, Laboratory Techniques in Biochemistry and Molecular Biology-Hybridization with Nucleic Acid Probes, ELSEVIER | - BATZER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081 | - OHTSUKA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608 | - ROSSOLINI ET AL., MOL. CELL PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - BAKKER ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1990), vol. 31, pages 1501 - 1509 | - CHATTOPADHYAY ET AL., NUCL. MED. BIOL., (2001), vol. 28, pages 741 - 744 | - DEWANJEE ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1994), vol. 35, pages 1054 - 63 | - KRENNING ET AL., LANCET, (1989), vol. 1, pages 242 - 244 | - SAGIUCHI ET AL., ANN. NUCL. MED., (2001), vol. 15, pages 267 - 270 | - YOO ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1997), vol. 38, pages 294 - 300 | - KRENNING ET AL., LANCET, (1989), vol. 1, pages 242 - 4 | - BAKKER ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1990), vol. 31, pages 1501 - 9 | - JONES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 254, pages 85 - 98 | - HOVES ET AL., METHODS, (2003), vol. 31, pages 127 - 34 | - PENG ET AL., CHIN. MED. SCI. J., (2002), vol. 17, pages 17 - 21 | - YASUHARA ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (2003), vol. 51, pages 873 - 885 | - BOGHAERT ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 4538 - 4549 | - ONN ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, no. 15, pages 5532 - 5539 | - YUHAS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1977), vol. 37, pages 3639 - 3643 | US20030699874 | other | WO2007106744 | EP1994055 | - SHAW DAVID M. ET AL, "Glycosylation and epitope mapping of the 5T4 glycoprotein oncofoetal antigen", Biochem. J., vol. 363, no. 1, (20020400), pages 137 - 145, XP002444306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3630137 | Opposition | WO03038098 | WO2006031653 | WO2011133039 | WO2012131527 | - Sapra et al., "Long-term Tumor Regression Induced by an Antibody-Drug Conjugate That Targets 5T4, an Oncofetal Antigen Expressed on Tumor-Initiating Cells", Molecular Cancer Therapeutics, (201301), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 38 - 47, XP055197709 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-12-0603 | - BOQHAERT et al., "The oncofetal protein, 5T4, is a suitable target for antibody-guided anti-cancer chemotherapy with calicheamicin", Int. J. Oncol., (20080000), vol. 32, pages 221 - 234, XP055051976 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/ijo.32.1.221 | - Doronina et al., "Enhanced Activity of Monomethylauristatin F through Monoclonal Antibody Delivery: Effects of Linker Technology on Efficacy and Toxicity", Bioconjugate Chemistry, (2006), vol. 17, pages 114 - 124, XP055009264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0502917 | - SHAW et al., "Glycosylation and epitope mapping of the 5T4 glycoprotein oncofoetal antigen", Biochem. J., (20020000), vol. 363, pages 137 - 145, XP002444306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3630137 | - MYERS et al., "TARGETING IMMUNE EFFECTOR MOLECULES TO HUMAN TUMOR CELLS THROUGH GENETIC DELIVERY OF 5T4-SPECIFIC SCFV FUSION PROTEINS", Cancer Gene Therapy, (20020000), vol. 9, pages 884 - 896, XP009007160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.cgt.7700513 | - FORSBERG et al., "Identification of framework residues in a secreted recombinant antibody fragment that control production level and localization in Escherichia coli", J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, no. 19, pages 12430 - 12436, XP002389356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.19.12430 | - FORSBERQ et al., "THERAPY OF HUMAN NON-SMALL-CELL LUNG CARCINOMA USING ANTIBODY TARGETING OF A MODIFIED SUPERANTIGEN", Br. J Cancer, (20010000), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 129 - 136, XP001145660 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/bjoc.2001.1891 | - SHAW et al., "Isolation of a high affinity scFv from a monoclonal antibody recognising the oncofoetal antigen 5T4", Biochem. Biophys. Acta, (20000000), vol. 1524, pages 238 - 246, XP004275928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(00)00165-3 | - "Chapter 1.9 - Routine Manufacture of MAbs", Jörg Knäblein, Modern Biopharmaceuticals, vol. 3, pages 1127 - 1132, XP055646597 | - Jain et al., "Current ADC Linker Chemistry", Pharmaceutical Research, (2015), vol. 32, pages 3526 - 3540, XP035553874 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-015-1657-7 |