EP2365389 - Positive-working lithographic printing plate precursor for infrared laser and process for making lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Yoshinori c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Noriaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Aoshima, Norio c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11154487.0 | 15.02.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | JP20100050565 | 08.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010050565 | JP20100063159 | 18.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010063159 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365389 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365389 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/095, G03F7/11, G03F7/32, B41C1/10 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
G03F7/091 (US);
G03F7/095 (EP,US);
G03F7/11 (EP,US);
G03F7/12 (US);
G03F7/322 (EP,US);
B41C2210/02 (EP,US);
B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
B41C2210/24 (EP,US);
B41C2210/262 (EP,US);
B41C2210/266 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | Positiv arbeitender Lithographiedruckplattenvorläufer für einen Infrarotlaser und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Lithographiedruckplatte | [2011/37] | English: | Positive-working lithographic printing plate precursor for infrared laser and process for making lithographic printing plate | [2011/37] | French: | Précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique à action positive pour laser à infrarouges et procédé de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression lithographique | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 09.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2011 | AL | 16.01.2013 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MK | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | RS | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | SM | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | IE | 15.02.2013 | LU | 15.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | FR | 18.03.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AL | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 16.01.2013 | ||
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 18.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AL | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 16.01.2013 | ||
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 18.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AL | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 16.01.2013 | ||
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 18.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 16.01.2013 | ||
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 18.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 18.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/43] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RS | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH10312058 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [AD] 1-16 * page 2, paragraphs 6-7 ** pages 9-13; example 1 *; | [AD]EP1903396 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [AD] 1-16 * pages 15-16; example 1 * * claim - *; | [A]US2009186301 (RAY KEVIN B [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * pages 17-18, paragraph 236 * * page 18, paragraph 237 * * page 19, paragraph 245 * | by applicant | GB434875 | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3276868 | US3280734 | US3881924 | US3902734 | US4115128 | US4123279 | US4153461 | JPS5463902 | US4283475 | US4327169 | JPS57142645 | JPS58112793 | JPS58112792 | JPS58125246 | JPS58159533 | JPS58173696 | JPS58181051 | JPS58181690 | JPS58194595 | JPS58220143 | JPS58224793 | JPS5941363 | JPS5948187 | JPS5973996 | JPS5984248 | JPS5984249 | JPS5984356 | JPS59121044 | JPS59146063 | JPS59146061 | JPS59202829 | JPS59216146 | JPS6052940 | JPS6059351 | JPS6063744 | JPS6078787 | JPS6088942 | JPS62170950 | US4689272 | JPS62251740 | JPS62293247 | JPS63127237 | US4756993 | JPH0296755 | JPH02220061 | JPH03100554 | JPH03208514 | JPH0413149 | JPH04178416 | JPH04178417 | US5148746 | US5156938 | JPH0513514B | JPH0545885 | JPH0519702B | JPH0635174 | GB2297719 | US5568768 | JPH10312058 | JPH11218914 | JPH11288093 | US6117913 | JP2002251003 | JP2003057820 | JP2003149799 | JP2003177533 | JP2003302750 | JP2004012770 | JP3622063B | JP2005099685 | JP2007017913 | JP2007086219 |