EP2359728 - Floor squeegee [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moerman NV Schutterijstraat 25 8760 Meulebeke / BE | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vande Vyvere, Guy Gaverstraat 1 9790 Wortegem / BE | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Ostyn, Frans KOB NV President Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Ostyn, Frans K.O.B. NV Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 11154539.8 | 15.02.2011 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | BE20100000093 | 18.02.2010 Original published format: BE 201000093 | [2011/34] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2359728 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Classification | IPC: | A47L1/15, A47L13/11, A47L13/12, A47L13/46 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
A47L13/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bodenrakel | [2011/34] | English: | Floor squeegee | [2011/34] | French: | Raclette de sols | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO2008117014 | DE29807244U |