EP2490029 - Vancomycin analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Catholique de Louvain Place de l'Université 1 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | For all designated states Université de Liège Avenue Pré-Aily, 4 4031 Angleur / BE | For all designated states Université de Mons Place du Parc 20 7000 Mons / BE | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles 50, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchand, Jacqueline / rue du Basson 48 6001, Marcinelle / BE | 02 /
Tulkens, Paul / Chaussée de Soignies 5 1404, Nivelles / BE | 03 /
Goormaghtigh, Erik / 66, rue de la Coquiane 7850, Enghien / BE | 04 /
De Coninck, Joël / 9, rue d'Hyon 7022, Mesvin / BE | 05 /
Joris, Bernard / 51 rue de la Gendarmerie 4141, Grivegnée / BE | 06 /
Carryn, Stéphane / Emiel Hullebroecklaan, 19 1930, Zaventem / BE | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Bounaga, Sakina, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2012/34] | Application number, filing date | 11154652.9 | 16.02.2011 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2490029 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/94 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/9446 (EP);
G01N2400/00 (EP);
G01N2410/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vancomycinanalyse | [2012/34] | English: | Vancomycin analysis | [2012/34] | French: | Analyse de vancomycine | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0184615 (LEPETIT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * last paragraph on page 2; example 4; claims 1, 4 and 13 *; | [I] - DAS GUPTA V ET AL, "Stability of vancomycin hydrochloride in 5% dextrose and 0.9% sodium chloride injections", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HOSPITAL PHARMACY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HOSPITAL PHARMACISTS, BETHESDA, MD, US, (19860701), vol. 43, no. 7, ISSN 0002-9289, pages 1729 - 1731, XP009150926 [I] 1-8,12-15 * abstract * | [A] - PLOCK NELE ET AL, "Successful management of discovered pH dependence in vancomycin recovery studies: novel HPLC method for microdialysis and plasma samples", BIOMEDICAL CHROMATOGRAPHY, (200504), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0269-3879, pages 237 - 244, XP002655861 [A] 1-15 * abstract; last full paragraph of the left-hand column on page 239; third, fourth and fifth full paragraphs of the left-hand column on page 240; first full paragraph of the right-hand column on page 243 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bmc.446 | [A] - MAHONEY D F ET AL, "A PEPTIDE BINDING CHROMOGENIC ASSAY FOR DETECTING GLYCOPEPTIDE ANTIBIOTICS", JOURNAL FOR INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, UK, (19890101), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0169-4146, pages 43 - 48, XP009150967 [A] 1-15 * abstract; tables I and III; page 44, right-hand column, lines 15-19; page 45, right-hand column, lines 10-12; paragraph bridging pages 45 and 46 * | [A] - HERNOUT ET AL, "Design and evaluation of analogues of the bacterial cell-wall peptidoglycan motif l-Lys-d-Ala-d-Ala for use in a vancomycin biosensor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20071101), vol. 17, no. 21, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.08.055, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 5758 - 5762, XP022267168 [A] 9-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.08.055 | [A] - YANAGISAWA CHIE ET AL, "Rapid Depletion of Free Vancomycin in Medium in the Presence of beta-Lactam Antibiotics and Growth Restoration in Staphylococcus aureus Strains with beta-Lactam-Induced Vancomycin Resistance", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (200901), vol. 53, no. 1, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 63 - 68, XP002655862 [A] 1-15 * paragraph bridging the two columns of page 64 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/aac.00762-08 |