EP2364027 - Automatic calibration of projection system using non-visible light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christie Digital Systems USA, Inc. 10550 Camden Drive Cypress, CA 90630 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flatt, Robert 27 Inadale Crt. Kitchener, Ontario N2M 2Z7 / CA | 02 /
Nicholson, Stuart 354 Red Osier Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2V8 / CA | 03 /
Wright, Kevin 102 Culpepper Dr. Waterloo, Ontario N2L 5S1 / CA | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/36] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11154904.4 | 17.02.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | US20100716772 | 03.03.2010 Original published format: US 716772 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364027 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2364027 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, H04N17/04 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
H04N9/3194 (EP,US);
H04N9/3147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatische Kalibrierung eines Projektionssystems mittels nichtsichtbarem Licht | [2011/36] | English: | Automatic calibration of projection system using non-visible light | [2011/36] | French: | Étalonnage automatique d'un système de projection utilisant de la lumière non visible | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006291014 (HIRATA KAZUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]JP2001083949 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al) [X] 1,4-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0083] - [0084] - [0 98] - [0104]; figures 6, 7, 41, 44, 57 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]WO0007376 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1,4-6,10-12 * page 10, line 8 - line 16 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 5; figure 1 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2009309826 (JUNG EDWARD K Y [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0071] , [0 87] - [0089] * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2005030486 (LEE JOHNNY CHUNG [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10-12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 44] , [0 52] * [Y] 8,9; | [XI]JP2005017350 (NEC VIEWTECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1,5-7,10 * abstract * [I] 2,3,8,9; | [X]JP2005037689 (NEC VIEWTECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO0147285 (JUSTSYSTEM CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 9 * [I] 2-9,11,12; | [A]US2008174742 (ITO YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20080289701 |