EP2319511 - Selective subtype alpha 2 adrenergic agents and methods for use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Phong X. 1048 Wingfoot Street Placentia, CA 92870 / US | 02 /
Chow, Ken 20 Tidal Surf Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | 03 /
Heidelbaugh, Todd M. 18886 Mount Castile Circle Fountain Valley, CA 92708 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11155339.2 | 11.05.2009 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | US20080053997P | 16.05.2008 Original published format: US 53997 P | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2319511 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2319511 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4168, A61P27/00, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61P1/12, A61P1/04, A61P9/12, A61P9/10, A61P11/02, A61P19/02, A61P25/14, A61P25/18, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61P43/00, A61P19/06, A61P25/16, A61P25/30, A61P9/04 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/4168 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selektive adrenerge Wirkstoffe vom Subtyp alpha 2 und Verfahren zu ihrer Verwendung | [2011/19] | English: | Selective subtype alpha 2 adrenergic agents and methods for use thereof | [2011/19] | French: | Agents sélectifs des récepteurs adrénergiques de sous-type alpha 2 et leurs méthodes d'utilisation | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 16.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/38] | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09747288.0 / EP2285372 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0123376 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * example 53 on page 24 claim 19 *; | [A]FR7072M (C.H. BOEHRINGER SOHN) [A] 1-10 * page 3, right hand column, lines 19-23 example 8 *; | [A]GB1174988 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, left hand column, lines 13-22 example 8 * | by applicant | WO9200073 | - HART, D. J. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1983), vol. 48, pages 289 - 294 | - HANS BUNDGAARD, DESIGN OF PRODRUGS: BIOREVERSIBLE DERIVATIVES FOR VARIOUS FUNCTIONAL GROUPS AND CHEMICAL ENTITIES | - BUNDGAARD ET AL., Int. J. of Pharmaceutics, ELSEVIER, (1984), vol. 22, pages 45 - 56 | - BUNDGAARD ET AL., Int. J. of Pharmaceutics, ELSEVIER, (1986), vol. 29, pages 19 - 28 | - MESSIER, PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1995), vol. 76, pages 308 - 311 | US19970610539 |