EP2453301 - Liquid crystal display with backlight frame structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AU Optronics Corporation No. 1, Li-Hsin Road 2, Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu / TW | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Chung-Min c/o AU Optronics Corporation No. 1, Li-Hsin Road 2 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu / TW | 02 /
Chang, Chia-Hsin c/o AU Optronics Corporation No. 1, Li-Hsin Road 2 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu / TW | 03 /
Wang, Ping-Fu c/o AU Optronics Corporation No. 1, Li-Hsin Road 2 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu / TW | 04 /
Tsai, Chia-Chang c/o AU Optronics Corporation No. 1, Li-Hsin Road 2 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu / TW | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Rosenheimer Straße 139 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/45] | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei Rosenheimer Strasse 139 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/20] | Lang, Christian LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rosenheimerstrasse 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11155503.3 | 22.02.2011 | [2012/20] | Priority number, date | US20100943285 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: US 943285 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2453301 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2453301 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2453301 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/1335 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
G02F1/133305 (US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
G02F1/133314 (EP,US);
G02F1/133317 (EP,US);
G02F1/13332 (EP,US);
G02F1/133322 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | G02F1/13357 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige mit Rückbeleuchtungsrahmenstruktur | [2012/20] | English: | Liquid crystal display with backlight frame structure | [2012/20] | French: | Écran à cristaux liquides avec structure de cadre de rétroéclairage | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2011 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 08.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14152738.2 / EP2749937 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2011 | AL | 17.02.2016 | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | RS | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | IE | 22.02.2016 | LU | 22.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
MT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010171897 (YUN SU-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,8-11 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0039] , [0054]; figures 1,2 * [I] 12; | [XI]WO2010004794 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036]; figure 1 * [I] 12; | [A]US6611302 (UEDA SHOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009103002 (ENOMOTO TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |