EP2365471 - Diagnosis assisting apparatus, coronary artery analyzing method and recording medium having a coronary artery analzying program stored therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Yoshiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 7-3 Akasaka 9-chome, Miato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [2011/37] | Application number, filing date | 11155534.8 | 23.02.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | JP20100050009 | 08.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010050009 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2365471 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2365471 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365471 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
G06T7/0016 (EP,US);
A61B6/5217 (US);
A61B5/02007 (US);
A61B6/5205 (US);
A61B6/5211 (US);
A61B5/02 (US);
G06T2207/10076 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20072 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | Diagnosehilfsvorrichtung, Herzarterienanalyseverfahren und Aufzeichnungsmedium mit einem Herzarterienanalyseprogramm darauf | [2011/37] | English: | Diagnosis assisting apparatus, coronary artery analyzing method and recording medium having a coronary artery analzying program stored therein | [2011/37] | French: | Appareil d'aide au diagnostic, procédé d'analyse d'artères coronaires et support d'enregistrement doté du programme d'analyse d'artères coronaires stocké sur celui-ci | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2011 | AL | 27.11.2013 | AT | 27.11.2013 | BE | 27.11.2013 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | RS | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | SM | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | IE | 23.02.2014 | LU | 23.02.2014 | NO | 27.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
RS | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2007001879 (KAFTAN JENS N [DE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] ** paragraphs [0053] - [0060] *; | [A]US2008118122 (SIROHEY SAAD AHMED [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0041] *; | [A] - PLASS A ET AL, "Coronary artery imaging with 64-slice computed tomography from cardiac surgical perspective", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CARDIO-THORACIC SURGERY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.EJCTS.2006.03.048, ISSN 1010-7940, (20060701), pages 109 - 116, (20060701), XP028056035 [A] 1-10 * page 110, column r, line 43 - page 111, column r, line l * * figures 1,2,5,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejcts.2006.03.048 | [A] - MARTIN KING ET AL, "Image quality evaluation of motion-contaminated calcified plaques in cardiac CT", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD, 2007. NSS '07. IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20071001), ISBN 978-1-4244-0922-8, pages 2717 - 2720, XP031206200 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2717, column l, line 1 - column r, line 7 * * page 2718, column l, line 4 - column r, line 8 * | by applicant | JP2009048679 | JP2009069895 | JP2009195561 | US7646903 | - A. SZYMCZAK ET AL., "Coronary Vessel Trees from 3D Imagery: A Topological Approach", MEDICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS, (2006), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.media.2006.05.002, pages 548 - 559, XP028013477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.media.2006.05.002 |