EP2340837 - COMBINATION TREATMENT OF CANCER COMPRISING EGFR/HER2 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/27] | Combination treatment of cancer comprising EGFR/HER2 inhibitors | ||
[2016/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solca, Flavio Gesslsgasse 10/6 1230, Wien / AT | 02 /
Amelsberg, Andree 4 Rolf's Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | 03 /
Van Meel, Jacobus C.A. Kaerntnergasse 6 2340, Moedling / AT | 04 /
Baum, Anke Hoeglmuellergasse 4/8 1050, Wien / AT | 05 /
Stehle, Gerd Jahnstr. 1 89584, Ehingen / DE | [2017/11] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Solca, Flavio Gesslsgasse 10/6 1230, Wien / AT | ||
02 /
Amelsberg, Andree 4 Rolf's Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | |||
03 /
Van Meel, Jacobus C.A. Kaerntnergasse 6 2340, Moedling / AT | |||
04 /
Baum, Anke Hoeglmuellergasse 4/8 1050, Wien / AT | |||
05 /
Stehle, Gerd Jahnstr. 1 89584, Ehingen / DE | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/27] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 11155582.7 | 09.11.2006 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | EP20050110669 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05110669 | [2011/27] | Previously filed application, date | EP20060819380 | 09.11.2006 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2340837 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2340837 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61P35/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | A61K31/337 | ||
Former IPC [2011/27] | A61K31/517, A61K31/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2011/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSBEHANDLUNG GEGEN KREBS MIT EGFR/HER2-HEMMERN | [2016/36] | English: | COMBINATION TREATMENT OF CANCER COMPRISING EGFR/HER2 INHIBITORS | [2016/43] | French: | TRAITEMENT COMBINÉ DU CANCER COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS EGFR/HER2 | [2016/43] |
Former [2011/27] | Kombinationsbehandlung gegen Krebs mit EGFR/HER2-Hemmern | ||
Former [2011/27] | Combination treatment of cancer comprising EGFR/HER2 inhibitors | ||
Former [2011/27] | Traitement combiné du cancer comprenant des inhibiteurs de EGFR/HER2 | Examination procedure | 30.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06819380.4 / EP1948180 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060819380) is 25.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2006 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | IE | 09.11.2017 | LU | 09.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.11.2006 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.11.2006 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0250043 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [XD] 1-35 * page 19, line 30 - page 20, line 3 *; | [X]WO2004096224 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 69, line 5 - page 71, line 11 *; | [XP]WO2006018182 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XP] 1-6,8,15,16,29,31 * claims 1,4,14-16 * | by applicant | WO0250043 | WO2004074263 | WO2005037824 | WO2004096224 | WO2004076454 | - LYNCH, NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 350, page 2129 | - PAEZ, SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, page 1497 | - PAO, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, (2004), vol. 101, page 13306 | - KWAK, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, (2005), vol. 102, page 7665 | - KOBAYASHI, NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 352, page 786 | - Journal of Clinical Oncology, 2006 ASCO Annual Meeting Proceedings, (20060620), vol. 24 |