EP2491971 - Needle adapter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/35] | Application number, filing date | 11155651.0 | 23.02.2011 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491971 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/34 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61M5/321 (EP,US);
A61M5/34 (US);
A61M5/3243 (EP,US);
A61M5/326 (EP,US);
A61M5/344 (EP,US);
A61M5/347 (US);
A61M5/348 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nadeladapter | [2012/35] | English: | Needle adapter | [2012/35] | French: | Adaptateur d'aiguilles | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2013/09] | 14.10.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2371086 (DAVID WATSON EDWARD, et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-9 * [I] 6-12; | [XI]DE847473 (BERTRAM ALBERT HEINRICH DR MED) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-3 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 6-12; | [XI]GB780775 (MACGREGOR INSTR COMPANY) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 6-12; | [XI]US4740205 (SELTZER LEILANI [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 6-12; | [XI]EP0364777 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-16 * * figures 1-9 * [I] 6-12; | [A]USRE37908E (KINSEY PHILLIP SPENCER [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - ** figure - * |