EP2365681 - ISA100.11a field communication management apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | [2017/32] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamoto, Yasuyuki c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | 02 /
Umemoto, Hideki c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | 03 /
Emori, Toshiyuki c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | 04 /
Mori, Hiroshi c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/37] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11156044.7 | 25.02.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | JP20100043948 | 01.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010043948 | JP20100185041 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010185041 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2365681 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2365681 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365681 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, G06F9/52, G05B19/042, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04W4/00 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G06F9/52 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25428 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | H04L29/08, G05B19/418, G06F11/00, H04L12/24, G06F9/46, H04W84/18, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/37] | H04L29/08, G05B19/418, G06F11/00, H04L12/24, G06F9/46, H04W84/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2011/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung der Feldkommunikation gemäss dem Standard ISA100.11a | [2011/37] | English: | ISA100.11a field communication management apparatus | [2011/37] | French: | Appareil de gestion de la communication de champ selon le standard ISA100.11a | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2011 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | IE | 25.02.2018 | LU | 25.02.2018 | MT | 25.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.02.2011 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.02.2011 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002091774 (NEC CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * * A computer translation of the whole patent application is available at the IPDL, digital library of the JPO-site (http://www.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl), under the URL: http://www4.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/Tokujitu/PAJdetail.ipdl?N0000=60&N0120=01&N2001=2&N3001=2002-091774; paragraph [0056] *; | [A]US2004092255 (JI DE [US], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] *; | [A]WO2008109774 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]US2009054033 (PRATT JR WALLACE A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0046] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraphs [0124] , [0126] , [0129] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0136] * * claim 45 *; | [A]WO2009026049 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 3 * page 1, line 26 - page 4, line 9 * * page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 3 *; | [A]US7536548 (BATKE BRIAN ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, lines 8-2, 58-60 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 10 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 67 * * column 10, line 59 - column 11, line 21 * * column 12, line 66 - column 13, line 15 *; | [A] - "ISA-100.11a-2009 Wireless systems for industrial automation: Process control and related applications", no. ISA-100.11a-2009, (20090101), pages 1 - 817, ISA STANDARDS, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF AUTOMATION, UNITED STATES, URL: http://www.isa.org/Template.cfm?Section=Standards2&template=/Ecommerce/ProductDisplay.cfm&ProductID=10766, XP008138284 [A] 1-9 * chapters 4.5.1 and 4.5.2; page 60, line 32 - page 62, line 14 * * chapter 4.6.11; page 66, line 31 - page 67, line 7 * * chapters 5.2.6 to 5.2.8; page 69, line 16 - page 75, line 18 * * chapter 6.1; page 94, line 2 - page 96, line 15 * * chapters 6.3.11.2.6.4 to 6.3.11.2.6.6; page 151, line 1 - page 156, line 9 * * chapter 8; page 167, line 1 - page 246, line l * * chapter 14; page 666, line 1 - page 693, line l * | by applicant | WO0207166 |