EP2372806 - Polarizer and organic electroluminescent device having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/40] | Polarizer and Organic Electroluminescent Device having the same | ||
[2018/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eom, Sang Yong Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dong Sub Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Heoh, Hoon Do Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/32] | Birchenough, Lewis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/40] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11156160.1 | 28.02.2011 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | KR20100028050 | 29.03.2010 Original published format: KR 20100028050 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2372806 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2372806 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2372806 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G02B5/22 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/86 (US);
G02B5/3033 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/841 (US);
H10K59/1201 (KR);
H10K59/38 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/871 (EP,KR);
H10K59/8791 (EP,KR);
H10K59/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Title | German: | Polarisator und organische Elektrolumineszenzvorrichtung damit | [2011/40] | English: | Polarizer and organic electroluminescent device having the same | [2018/19] | French: | Polariseur et dispositif électroluminescent organique doté de celui-ci | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/40] | Polarizer and Organic Electroluminescent Device having the same | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2011 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | IE | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | MT | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2004227698 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [X] 8-10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0066]; figures 1,2,12 * [A] 4-7 [Y] 1-3,11,13,15; | [Y]EP1791003 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 11,13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0016] *; | [Y]US2009040443 (HADA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 15* paragraphs [0099] , [0136] *; | [Y]WO2009054168 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2009322214 (LEE DUK-JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0045] - [0066]; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-7; | US2010277684 [ ] (FUKUSHIMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0030] , [0054] , [0066] - [0068]; figure 1 * |