EP2364941 - Roll winding device and method for treating a web roll material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/37] | Roll winding device and method for treating a sheet roll of material | ||
[2013/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89520 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gugel, Henning / Lessingstr. 16 47669, Wachtendonk / DE | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/37] | Application number, filing date | 11156348.2 | 01.03.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | DE20101002718 | 10.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010002718 | [2011/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364941 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2364941 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP);
B65H2301/41361 (EP);
B65H2301/41552 (EP);
B65H2301/41732 (EP);
B65H2301/543 (EP);
B65H2801/84 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rollenwickelvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Behandlung einer Materialbahnrolle | [2011/37] | English: | Roll winding device and method for treating a web roll material | [2013/35] | French: | Dispositif d'enroulement de rouleaux et procédé de traitement d'un rouleau de matériau | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/37] | Roll winding device and method for treating a sheet roll of material | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 21.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004049719 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0029] - [0037] - [0041] - [0045] * * figures 1a-1d *; | [XI]JP2003118897 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * figure 13 * [I] 2,3,10,11; | [A]US2003089817 (HANSON JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 4,7,8 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0071] , [0080] - [0083] * * figures 1-7,10a *; | [A]EP1792859 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] - [0038] - [0041] * * figures 1-7 * |