EP2363899 - Piezoelectric film, piezoelectric device, liquid ejection apparatus, and method of producing piezoelectric film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naono, Takayuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577, Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11156562.8 | 02.03.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | JP20100046802 | 03.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010046802 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2363899 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2363899 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/18 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2/1612 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1645 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
H10N30/076 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Film, piezoelektrische Vorrichtung, Flüssigkeitsausgabegerät und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines piezoelektrischen Films | [2011/36] | English: | Piezoelectric film, piezoelectric device, liquid ejection apparatus, and method of producing piezoelectric film | [2011/36] | French: | Film piézoélectrique, dispositif piézoélectrique, appareil d'éjection de liquide et procédé de fabrication du film piézoélectrique | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6411017 (QIU HONG [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-2 *; | [XI]US2008278038 (KOBAYASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0162] * [I] 4 | by applicant | JPH11307833 | JP2008277672 |