EP2327592 - Airbag device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd. 10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0014 / JP | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniyama, Hiroyuki 19-1, Nishimachi, Shinke, Higashi Osaka-shi Osaka 577-0028 / JP | 02 /
Yamaji, Naoki c/o Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd. Osaka Plant, 11-6, 7-chome, Senrioka Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0001 / JP | 03 /
Kamura, Seiichiro c/o Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd. Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-chome, Senrioka Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0001 / JP | 04 /
Azuma, Hidetaka 187, Bukkoji-dori Nishinotouin Nishi-iru Tokusayamacho, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6008461 / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Kou 503, 3-18, Higashi-Izumioka 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0861 / JP | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Appelt, Christian W., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11156985.1 | 25.01.2005 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | JP20040022943 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004022943 | JP20040022944 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004022944 | JP20040022945 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004022945 | JP20040022946 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004022946 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327592 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16, B60R21/233 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
B60R21/2338 (EP,US);
B60R21/203 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/20 (KR);
B60R21/21656 (EP,US);
B60R2021/21543 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23382 (EP,US);
B60R21/239 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/22] | Title | German: | Airbagvorrichtung | [2011/22] | English: | Airbag device | [2011/22] | French: | Dispositif d'airbag | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05709301.5 / EP1710132 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050709301) is 11.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03031237 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * Fig.1,2; page 1 line 25 - page 2 line 5; page 1, line 20 - page 11, line 18; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-6; | [I]EP1155924 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0026]; figure -; claim - *; | [IA]US3618979 (GULETTE RONALD S) [I] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6; | [XI]DE20102107U (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 17 - page 6, line 5; figure - * [I] 2-6; | [A]WO03062023 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 24 - page 12, line 11; figure -; claim - * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE10036759 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0026]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US2003042717 | US2004021303 |