EP2333986 - Radio channel control method and receiving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furukawa, Hideto c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 8588 / JP | 02 /
Dateki, Takashi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 8588 / JP | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Furukawa, Hideto c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Dateki, Takashi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/47] |
Former [2011/24] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11157228.5 | 20.02.2003 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2333986 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2333986 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333986 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/12, H04W52/22, H04L1/00, H04L1/20, H04W52/24 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
H04W52/228 (EP);
H04L1/0021 (EP);
H04L1/20 (EP);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/0025 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | H04B7/26, H04L1/20, H04L1/00, H04W52/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/24] | Title | German: | Funkkanalsteuerungsverfahren und Empfängervorrichtung | [2011/24] | English: | Radio channel control method and receiving apparatus | [2011/24] | French: | Procédé de commande de canal radio et appareil de réception | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03705365.9 / EP1542378 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030705365) is 18.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6137840 (TIEDEMANN JR EDWARD G [US], et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]EP1204225 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0069] - [0091] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [X]EP1249951 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] , [0018] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0109] - [0122] * * paragraph [0135] * * paragraphs [0145] - [0147] * * paragraphs [0150] - [0155] * * paragraphs [0181] , [0182] * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2003003905 (SHVODIAN WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1422898 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069] * * paragraphs [0078] , [0079] * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | JPH1188940 | JP2001238256 | JP2001339458 | JP2002084578 | EP20030705365 |