EP2345540 - Heat-sensitive recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsunaga, Yoshiaki Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Kaneko, Yoshikazu 651-46, Higashihara Numazu-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11157714.4 | 06.03.2008 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | JP20070056733 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007056733 | [2011/29] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080102362 | 06.03.2008 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2345540 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/333 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
B41M5/3336 (EP,US);
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M2205/04 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2011/29] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [2011/29] | English: | Heat-sensitive recording material | [2011/29] | French: | Matériel d'enregistrement sensible à la chaleur | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 21.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08102362.4 / EP1967379 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080102362) is 16.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1738919 (NICCA CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1452334 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [AD]JPS62225391 (KOHJIN CO) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * |