EP2498455 - Method and system to coordinate the communication channel access in a technology independent way in order to improve channel efficiency and to provide QoS guarantees [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sivchenko, Dimitri Heidelberger Strasse 28 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Bayer, Nico Arthur-Weber-Weg 4 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | 03 /
Thiel, karl Adam- Schwinn-Strasse 24 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | 04 /
Sengul, Cigdem Wartburgstrasse 25 10825 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Martinez Olmo, Maria Carolina Avda Communidad de Madrid 10 edificio ronda 1,3 A Pozuelo de alcaron 28224 Madrid / ES | 06 /
Eznarriaga Barranco, Lucas C/ de la Redondilla 12, 3 dcha 28005 Madrid / ES | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11157732.6 | 10.03.2011 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498455 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04W72/00, H04W74/08, H04L12/417, H04L12/403 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
H04L12/403 (EP);
H04W72/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Koordination des Kommunikationskanalzugriffs auf technologieunabhängige Art zur Verbesserung der Kanaleffizienz und zur Bereitstellung von Dienstgütegarantien | [2012/37] | English: | Method and system to coordinate the communication channel access in a technology independent way in order to improve channel efficiency and to provide QoS guarantees | [2012/37] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de coordonner l'accès à un canal de communication de manière indépendante de la technologie afin d'améliorer l'efficacité de canal et fournir des garanties QoS | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1233574 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * claims 1-3,28,35 * * figures 4,7a,7b * [I] 6-10; | [I]US2003182479 (MASSA DIETER [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-3B,4,5 ** claims 1-11,21-27 * | by applicant | - G. BIANCHI, "Performance analysis of the IEEE 802.11 distributed coordination function", Selected Areas in Communications", IEEE JOURNAL, vol. 18, no. 3, page 535 | - TZU-JANE TSAI; JU-WEI CHEN, "IEEE 802.11 MAC protocol over wireless mesh networks: problems and perspectives, Advanced Information Networking and Applications", AINA 2005, (2005), vol. 2, pages 60 - 63 |