EP2498232 - Detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt International (SWE) AB Englundavägen 7 171 41 Solna Stockholm / SE | [2016/15] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Siemens AB Englundavägen 7 17141 Solna / SE | ||
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachels, Thomas Mühlauerstrasse 8 5636 Benzenschwil / CH | 02 /
Erni, Andreas Zugematte 13 6340 Baar / CH | 03 /
Fischer, Simon Daniel Hinterdorfstrasse 11a 6042 Dietwil / CH | 04 /
Gruber, Peter Tränkebachstrasse 18 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/37] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11157762.3 | 10.03.2011 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498232 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/191, G08B29/04 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
G08B13/191 (EP,US);
G08B29/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Detektor | [2012/37] | English: | Detector | [2012/37] | French: | Détecteur | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0191155 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph l * * figures 1,2 * [A] 7; | [YA]EP0772171 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * column 7, line 6 - line 25 * * figure 4 *[A] 7 | by applicant | EP0189536 | EP0191155 | EP20100190290 |