EP2328191 - Light-emitting diode arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bogner, Georg Am Sandbügel 12 93138, Lappersdorf / DE | 02 /
Grötsch, Stefan Waldstraße 6 93077, Lengfeld - Bad Abbach / DE | 03 /
Wanninger, Mario Vorlandweg 4 93055, Regensburg / DE | 04 /
Waitl, Günter Praschweg 3 93049, Regensburg / DE | [2014/36] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Bogner, Georg Am Sandbügel 12 93138, Lappersdorf / DE | ||
02 /
Grötsch, Stefan Waldstraße 6 93077, Lengfeld - Bad Abbach / DE | |||
03 /
Wanninger, Mario Vorlandweg 4 93055, Regensburg / DE | |||
04 /
Waitl, Günter Praschweg 3 93049, Regensburg / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2014/36] |
Former [2011/22] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11158098.1 | 18.05.2005 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | DE20041031686 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004031686 | DE20041045947 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045947 | [2011/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2328191 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2328191 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328191 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/62, H01L33/64, // H01L33/58, H01L33/60 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L33/64 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
H01L33/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | H01L33/60, H01L33/62, H01L33/64, // H01L33/58 | Designated contracting states | DE [2011/22] | Title | German: | Leuchtdiodenanordnung | [2011/22] | English: | Light-emitting diode arrangement | [2011/22] | French: | Ensemble lumineux à diodes électroluminescentes | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 20.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05753601.3 / EP1761959 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050753601) is 18.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004027067 (SONG KYUNG-SUB [KR], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0036] - [0041]; figures 2A,2B * | by applicant | US5684309 | WO9812757 | WO9831055 | US5831277 | EP1017113 | WO0139282 | US6657375 | - I. SCHNITZER, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (19931018), vol. 63, no. 16, pages 2174 - 2176 |