EP2343144 - Means for preventing tools from being pulled out from tool holders with a tool holding fixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Haimer Maschinenbau KG Weiherstrasse 21 86568 Hollenbach-Igenhausen / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Franz Haimer Maschinenbau KG Weiherstrasse 21 86568 Hollenbach-Igenhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haimer, Franz Weiherstrasse 21 86568, Igenhausen / DE | [2019/02] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
Haimer, Franz Weiherstrasse 21 86568, Igenhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Wolfgang Haimer GmbH Weiherstraße 21 86568 Hollenbach-Igenhausen / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2019/02] | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11158389.4 | 05.04.2007 | [2011/28] | Priority number, date | DE20061016784 | 10.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006016784 | DE20061028408 | 19.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006028408 | [2011/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343144 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343144 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2343144 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/00, B24B45/00, B23B31/117, B23B31/107, B23B31/40 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B23B31/005 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/1072 (CN);
B23B31/10 (US);
B23B31/1071 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/1175 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/1179 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/40 (EP,KR,US);
B24B45/006 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2231/026 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2231/04 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2240/04 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2260/042 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2260/138 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T279/1021 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17316 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17888 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17897 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17923 (EP,US);
Y10T408/907 (EP,US);
Y10T408/94 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | B23B31/107, B23B31/117, B23B31/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2011/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auszugssicherung von Werkzeugen aus Werkzeughaltern mit einer Werkzeugaufnahme | [2011/28] | English: | Means for preventing tools from being pulled out from tool holders with a tool holding fixture | [2011/28] | French: | Securité anti-extraction d'outils de porte-outils munis d'un attachement d'outil | [2018/34] |
Former [2011/28] | Sécurité anti-extraction d'outils de porte-outils munis d'un attachement d'outil | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 28.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Observations by third parties | 02.07.2015 | Observations by third parties | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Observations by third parties | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2017 | Observations by third parties | 24.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07724059.6 / EP2004351 | Divisional application(s) | EP17195584.2 / EP3300822 | EP18192952.2 / EP3427874 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070724059) is 18.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2019
12.09.2019
ADMISSIBLE Körfer, Thomas Parsevalstrasse 8 86415 Mering / DE Opponent's representative Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | 02
09.10.2019
25.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE MST Corporation 1738 Kitahara Ikoma Nara 630-0142 / JP Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2019
12.09.2019
ADMISSIBLE Körfer, Thomas Parsevalstrasse 8 86415 Mering / DE Opponent's representative Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
02
09.10.2019
25.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE MST Corporation 1738 Kitahara Ikoma Nara 630-0142 / JP Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2019
12.09.2019
ADMISSIBLE Körfer, Thomas Parsevalstrasse 8 86415 Mering / DE Opponent's representative Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | 22.01.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.07.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 11.07.2022 | Appeal received No. T1625/22 | 11.07.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 09.09.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.06.2022 | Appeal received No. T1625/22 | 29.06.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 29.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2007 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | IE | 05.04.2019 | LU | 05.04.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.04.2007 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4377292 (STARON JOHN C); | [X]US5234296 (PRESBY THOMAS J [US], et al); | [X]EP1029620 (NIKKEN KOSAKUSHO WORKS LTD [JP]); | [X]JP2002355727 (DAISHOWA SEIKI); | [X]US2005238451 (HARTMAN DAVID [US]) | by applicant | WO0189758 | other | DE1049193 | FR1272885 | DE1272885 | DE3939423 | DE102006028408 | DE102006062973 | Opposition | DE846952 | DE920336 | DE1008085 | FR1272885 | CH401803 | US3719367 | JPS4895278 | DE7513937U | JPS55175010U | JPS5723909U | US4377292 | JPS5914121U | JPS6116204U | JPS6161106U | JPS61175312 | JPS6317707U | JPS6335521U | DE3736302 | DE3911159 | DE3939423 | WO9221469 | DE4222809 | DE4125501 | DE9201729U | US5234296 | DE4010597 | US5279194 | WO9604089 | US5556399 | JPH0911007 | DE29708384U | JPH09216107 | JPH10100009 | WO9919598 | EP1029620 | JP2001009612 | US6199872 | US6302408 | US2001042964 | DE10100024 | JP2002355727 | DE10129501 | EP1291103 | DE69715654T | DE202004010714U | US2005238451 | JP2006150508 | EP2001624 | DE202007019453U | DE102006062973 | DE1049193 | CH542014 | JPS4895278U | DE2610730 | DE3815455 | US4995768 | DE4010597 | US5971670 | JP2000317768 | DE19935960 | WO0189758 | DE202004010724U | DE10312743 | DE60010217T | DE102005029999 |