EP2500309 - Energy management system for solar-powered elevator installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossignol, Eric / Via Cantonale 64 6573, Magadino / CH | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Blöchle, Hans, et al Inventio AG, Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2012/38] | Application number, filing date | 11158872.9 | 18.03.2011 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500309 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/30 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
B66B1/302 (EP,US);
H02J9/061 (CN);
B66B1/06 (CN);
H02J9/068 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Energieverwaltungssystem für solarbetriebene Liftanlage | [2012/38] | English: | Energy management system for solar-powered elevator installation | [2012/38] | French: | Système de gestion de l'énergie pour une installation d'ascenseur alimentée par l'énergie solaire | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9825849 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * abstract *; | [X]CN101618825 (QINGDAO PREC ELEVATOR CO LTD) [X] 10,11 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH04272073 | CN101544332 |