EP2338370 - Footwear including replaceable outsole members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton Oregon 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kilgore, Bruce 1244 Hood View Lane Lake Oswego, OR Oregon 97035 / US | 02 /
Berend, Thomas 18052 SW Loxley Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97007 / US | 03 /
Dean, Anthony 3519 Willow Oak Drive Newberg, OR Oregon 97132 / US | 04 /
Daversa, Anthony 16630 NW Somerset Dr. Beaverton, OR Oregon 97006 / US | 05 /
Eisenbach, Lawrence Patents Department Nike, Inc. MH-1 One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/44] | 01 /
Kilgore, Bruce 1244 Hood View Lane Lake Oswego, OR OR 97035 / US | ||
02 /
Berend, Thomas 18052 SW Loxley Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97007 / US | |||
03 /
Dean, Anthony 3519 Willow Oak Drive Newberg, Oregon 97132 / US | |||
04 /
Daversa, Anthony 16630 NW Somerset Dr. Beaverton, OR OR 97006 / US | |||
05 /
Eisenbach, Lawrence Patents Department Nicke Inc. MH-1 One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97005 / US | |||
Former [2011/42] | 01 /
Kilgore, Bruce 1244 Hood View Lane Lake Oswego, OR OR 97035 / US | ||
02 /
Berend, Thomas 18052 SW Loxley Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97007 / US | |||
03 /
Dean, Anthony 3519 Willow Oak Drive Newberg, Oregon 97132 / US | |||
04 /
Daversa, Anthony 16630 NW Somerset Dr. Beaverton, OR OR 97006 / US | |||
05 /
Eisenbach, Lawrence 1 Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97005 / US | |||
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Kilgore, Bruce 1244 Hood View Lane Lake Oswego, OR OR 97035 / US | ||
02 /
Berend, Thomas 18052 SW Loxley Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97007 / US | |||
03 /
Dean, Anthony 16100 SW Century Dr. 24 Sherwood, OR OR 97140 / US | |||
04 /
Daversa, Anthony 16630 NW Somerset Dr. Beaverton, OR OR 97006 / US | |||
05 /
Eisenbach, Lawrence 1 Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97005 / US | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 11158876.0 | 13.10.2005 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | US20040986166 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 986166 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338370 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338370 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/36, A43B3/24, A43B5/18 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
A43B3/246 (EP,US);
A43B13/36 (EP,US);
A43B3/24 (EP,US);
A43B5/18 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | Schuh mit auswechselbaren Laufsohlen | [2014/44] | English: | Footwear including replaceable outsole members | [2011/26] | French: | Chaussure comportant des éléments de semelle interchangeables | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/26] | Schuh mit auswechselbaren Laufsohlen | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05809897.1 / EP1811871 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050809897) is 19.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2005 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.10.2005 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4267650 (BAUER PETER) [X] 5-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-4; | [XY]WO8604489 (SAFFRON JACK SPORTS [US]) [X] 5-15 * page 8, line 28 - page 14, line 3; figures 1-8 * [Y] 1,2; | [XY]EP0565913 (WORLITZER STEFAN [DE]) [X] 5-15 * column 3, lines 7-38 * * column 4, lines 29-40 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 20 * * figure - * [Y] 1,2; | [XA]US5410821 (HILGENDORF ERIC [US]) [X] 5-15 * the whole document *[A] 1-4; | [XA]US6345454 (COTTON JOHNNY CARMICHAEL [US]) [X] 5-15 * the whole document * [A] 1 |