EP2337125 - Lithium transition metal based compound powder and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shizuka, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center Inc. 3-1, Chuo 8-chome, Ami-machi Inasiki-gun Inasiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | 02 /
Okahara, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center Inc. 3-1, Chuo 8-chome, Ami-machi Inasiki-gun Inasiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | 03 /
Kikuchi, Kazuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center Inc. 3-1, Chuo 8-chome, Ami-machi Inasiki-gun Inasiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | 04 /
Terada, Kaoru c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center Inc. 3-1, Chuo 8-chome, Ami-machi Inasiki-gun Inasiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11159159.0 | 21.12.2007 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | JP20060349912 | 26.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006349912 | JP20070079360 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007079360 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337125 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/50, H01M4/52 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
C01G53/50 (US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M10/0585 (US);
H01M4/04 (KR);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (US);
H01M4/623 (US);
H01M4/625 (US);
H01M4/661 (US);
H01M4/80 (US);
H01M50/44 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M2300/004 (US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/1391 (US);
H01M4/1393 (US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Lithium-Übergangsmetall-Pulver und Methode zu seiner Herstellung | [2011/25] | English: | Lithium transition metal based compound powder and method for manufacturing the same | [2011/25] | French: | Poudre d'un métal de transition lithié et son procédé de production | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07859978.4 / EP2110872 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070859978) is 14.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH10241691 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0019] , [0036] , [0042] - [0045] *[I] 4 | by applicant | JPH04253162 | JPH04328258 | JPH0547384 | JPH0554889 | JPH05325971 | JPH0855624 | JPH08213052 | JPH10241691 | JPH1116566 | JP2000048820 | JP2000113884 | JP3088716B | WO0241419 | JP2002260632 | JP2002304993 | JP3362025B | JP2003031219 | JP2004152753 | JP2004303673 | JP2004335278 | JP2005235628 | JP2005251716 | JP2005320184 | JP2006164934 | JP2006349912 | JP2007079360 | - MICROELECTRONICS JOURNAL, (2005), vol. 36, page 491 | - J. POWER SOURCES, (2001), vol. 102, page 162 | - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (2004), vol. 151, page A1789 |