EP2337030 - Maintenance operations for multi-level data storage cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornwell, Michael J. 116 South Third Street San Jose, CA 95112 / US | 02 /
Dudte, Christopher P. 1438 Scollon Court San Jose, CA 95132-2326 / US | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Cornwell, Michael J. 116 South Third Street San Jose, CA 95112 / US | ||
02 /
Dudte, Christopher P. 1438 Scollon Court San Jose, CA 95132-2326 / US | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 11159444.6 | 14.05.2007 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20060800357P | 15.05.2006 Original published format: US 800357 P | US20070694739 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 694739 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337030 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337030 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/56, G11C16/26, G11C29/42 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
G11C16/26 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (KR);
G11C11/5642 (EP,US);
G11C16/34 (KR);
G11C16/3418 (EP,US);
G11C16/3431 (EP,US);
G11C16/349 (EP,US);
G11C11/5628 (EP,US);
G11C16/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2011/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Bitauflösung in Speicherzellen | [2011/25] | English: | Maintenance operations for multi-level data storage cells | [2011/25] | French: | Résolution dynamique de cellules de bit | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07762158.9 / EP2022058 | EP10164178.5 / EP2221827 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070762158) is 18.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees RO, FI, BE, TR, SK, SI, SE, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, AT | 29.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 29.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2007 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | IE | 14.05.2016 | LU | 14.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GB | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.05.2007 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.05.2007 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5541886 (HASBUN ROBERT [US]) [X] 1 * column 12, line 42 - column 13, line 44; figure 6 *; | [X]WO0163615 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005007801 (BARZILAI RON [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0030] , [0031] , [0050] - [0062] - [0068]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2005052934 (TRAN HIEU VAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0066] - [0076]; figures 5,7 *; | [X]US2005180209 (LASSER MENAHEM [IL]) [X] 1* the whole document * | Examination | US5930167 |