EP2368468 - Gas barbecue with refractory stones, in particular for cooking japanese spits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inter Cuisines 31 Rue Jean Roche 94400 Vitry sur Seine / FR | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ma, Weile / 32 rue de la Ferme 91400, ORSAY / FR | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Kohn, Philippe, et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Kohn, Philippe, et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | Application number, filing date | 11159559.1 | 24.03.2011 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | FR20100052161 | 25.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1052161 | [2011/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368468 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/07 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
A47J37/0713 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gas-Barbecue mit feuerfesten Steinen, insbesondere zum Kochen von japanischen Spiessen | [2011/39] | English: | Gas barbecue with refractory stones, in particular for cooking japanese spits | [2011/39] | French: | Barbecue à gaz et pierres réfractaires, notamment pour la cuisson de brochettes japonaises | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE9413881U (CASONA GASTRONOMIEBEDARF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10 * page 9, paragraph 5 - page 17, paragraph 4; figure - * [Y] 4,9 [I] 6,8; | [Y]FR2912048 (APPLIC DES GAZ SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR]) [Y] 4 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 28; figure - *; | [Y]US6761160 (HAYGOOD LAWTON [US]) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 44 - column 5; figure 7 *; | [A]US6561179 (BRAKE GEORGE R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 26; figure - *; | [A]US6000389 (ALPERT GERALD [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 17 - column 8, line 17; figure - *; | [A]US5676048 (SCHROETER WOLFGANG [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 10 - column 9, line 20; figure - * * column 7, lines 51-58 *; | [A]US2007240583 (LEE IK-NO [KR]) [A] 4 * paragraphs [0064] - [0128]; figure - * |