EP2502849 - Multi-chamber, individually accessible pouch for content dispensing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mamiye, Marc 58 Amber Drive Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Straube, Urs Norman Apley & Straube Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Schatzenberg 2 77871 Renchen / DE | [2012/39] | Application number, filing date | 11159669.8 | 24.03.2011 | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2502849 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65D81/32 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
B65D81/3261 (EP);
B65D75/5816 (EP);
B65D75/5883 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beutel mit mehreren einzeln zugänglichen Kammern zur Inhaltsausgabe | [2012/39] | English: | Multi-chamber, individually accessible pouch for content dispensing | [2012/39] | French: | Poche accessible individuellement à plusieurs chambres pour la fourniture de contenu | [2012/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2791324 (DOW KNOOP HERBERT, et al) [I] 1,10,15 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, paragraph 2; figures 1,4,6 *; | [XI]FR2760436 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1 * [I] 2-15; | [A]GB2350102 (PEPSICO INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 11 - page 13, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2005194060 (HOUWAERT VINCENT [BE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0095]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1669303 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0040] * |