EP2369168 - Hydropower screw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jank, Siegfried Schweiber 9 5225 Jeging / AT | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Singerstrasse 8/3/9 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 11159770.4 | 25.03.2011 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | AT20100000200U | 25.03.2010 Original published format: AT 20010 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2011/39] | AT20100000200U | 25.03.2010 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2369168 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2369168 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03B3/10, E02B8/08, F03B11/02 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
F03B3/10 (EP);
E02B8/085 (EP);
F03B11/025 (EP);
F03B7/00 (EP);
F05B2240/243 (EP);
F05B2240/33 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | F03B3/10, E02B8/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wasserkraftschnecke | [2011/39] | English: | Hydropower screw | [2011/39] | French: | Vis hydrodynamique | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 14.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010001529 (ROSEFSKY JONATHAN B [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figures 6-7 * [A] 11-13 [I] 3-6,8-10,14-16; | [A]EP1930597 (WITTEVEEN & BOS RAADGEVENDE IN [NL]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-4 * |