EP2375319 - Audio/video apparatus and signal control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Bong-hwan Sinmaetan We've Haneulchae Apt 117-401 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ahn, Yoon-soon Gwanghwamun Poonglim Spaceborn Apt 106-806 9-1 Sajik-dong Jongno-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Yang, Sun-ho Yeouido Sibeom Apt 8-1105 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Sang-hoon Byeokjeokgol 9-danji Apt 914-1103 Yeongtong 2-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Na, Moon-sung Sinbong Centreville Apt 102-702 244 Sinbong-dong Suji-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11159964.3 | 28.03.2011 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | US20100319963P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 319963 P | KR20100071944 | 26.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100071944 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375319 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04N7/24, H04N21/41, H04N21/442, H04N21/4402, H04N21/4363, H04N21/436 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/44227 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/4363 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Audio-/Videovorrichtung und Signalsteuerungsverfahren dafür | [2011/41] | English: | Audio/video apparatus and signal control method thereof | [2011/41] | French: | Appareil audio/vidéo et son procédé de commande de signal | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 24.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 24.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/52] | 06.08.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009091656 (KITARU KATSUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0064] , [0082] , [0129] , [0151] - [0156] - [0164] , [0165] , [0199] , [0212] , [0231]; figures 1-3,8 * [I] 2-6,9,11-15; | [XY]EP2166763 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7,10 * pages 9-16; figures 10-16 * [Y] 2-6,8,9,11-15; | [XY]WO2009006484 (SILICON IMAGE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,10 * pages 9-16; figure 4 * [Y] 2-6,8,9,11-15 |