EP2506464 - Audio processing apparatus and method of outputting status information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries Ltd. Cranborne House Cranborne Road Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 3JN / GB | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Andy 50 Church Drive Harrow Middlesex, HA2 7NS / GB | 02 /
Sonnleitner, Philipp Erzherzog Johann Gasse, 22 8200, Gleisdorf / AT | 03 /
Huber, Robert Nassackerstrasse 3 8952 Schlieren / CH | 04 /
Sörensen, Björn Wuhrstraße, 15 8003, Zürich / CH | 05 /
Meier, Detlef Seestraße, 69 8712, Stäfa / CH | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Bertsch, Florian Oliver Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Bertsch, Florian Oliver Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11160535.8 | 30.03.2011 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506464 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/04 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H04H60/04 (EP,US);
H04R3/00 (KR);
H04R29/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Audio-Verarbeitungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ausgabe von Statusinformation | [2012/40] | English: | Audio processing apparatus and method of outputting status information | [2012/40] | French: | Appareil de traitement audio et procédé de sortie d'informations d'état | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 13.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.07.2018 | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/48] | 12.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1841108 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] - [0015] - [0028] - [0033] , [0034] , [0043] , [0048] , [0052] , [0055] , [0061]; figures 1,5 * [I] 2-11,13,14; | [A]US2011007666 (GURDAN ROBBY [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] - [0075] - [0089] *; | [A]EP1580910 (HARMAN INT IND [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009] - [0044] - [0058] - [0116] , [0125] , [0128] , [0135] , [0143] , [0152] * |