EP2374545 - Irrigation sprinkler nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rain Bird Corporation 970 West Sierra Madre Avenue Azusa, CA 91702 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Rain Bird Corporation 1000 West Sierra Madre Avenue Azusa, CA 91702 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Eugene Ezekiel / 6751 San Diego Drive Buena Park, CA 90620 / US | 02 /
Robertson, David Eugene / 1054 Newhill Street Glendora, CA 91741 / US | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/41] | Schurack, Eduard F. Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Patentanwälte Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11161717.1 | 08.04.2011 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | US20100757912 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 757912 | US20100859159 | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 859159 | US201113069334 | 22.03.2011 Original published format: US201113069334 | [2013/13] |
Former [2011/41] | US20100757912 | 09.04.2010 | |
US20100859159 | 18.08.2010 | ||
US20110069334 | 22.03.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2374545 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2374545 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/26, A01G25/00, // B05B3/02 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
A01G25/00 (EP,US);
B05B1/267 (EP,US);
B05B3/021 (EP,US);
Y02A40/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | B05B1/26, A01G25/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/41] | B05B1/26, B05B1/30, A01G25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bewässerungsregnerdüse | [2011/41] | English: | Irrigation sprinkler nozzle | [2011/41] | French: | Buse d'arrosage pour irrigation | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1283591 (PERROT REGNERBAU GMBH & CO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3335805 (RAUCH LANDMASCHFAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 3-5 * | by applicant | US20100757912 |