EP2360884 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING A SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/34] | Apparatus and method for transmitting and receiving a signal | ||
[2015/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states LG Electronics 20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Woo Suk LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-Gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Moon, Sang Chul LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-Gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | [2015/41] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
Ko, Woo Suk LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-dong, Seocho-Gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Moon, Sang Chul LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-Gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/34] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11162308.8 | 03.06.2009 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | US20080107329P | 21.10.2008 Original published format: US 107329 P | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360884 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2360884 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
H04L27/2626 (EP,US);
H03M13/1102 (US);
H04B1/38 (US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/2627 (US);
H04L27/2647 (US);
H04L27/2698 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04J2011/0009 (US);
H04L27/26132 (EP,US);
H04L27/26134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINES SIGNALS | [2015/21] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING A SIGNAL | [2015/21] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA TRANSMISSION ET LA RÉCEPTION D'UN SIGNAL | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/34] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Senden und Empfangen eines Signals | ||
Former [2011/34] | Apparatus and method for transmitting and receiving a signal | ||
Former [2011/34] | Appareil et procédé pour la transmission et la réception d'un signal | Examination procedure | 13.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2012 | 06.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09161842.1 / EP2180648 | EP10165887.0 / EP2239904 | Divisional application(s) | EP15164121.4 / EP2928102 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090161842) is 09.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2015 | BE | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | IE | 03.06.2016 | LU | 03.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
IE | 03.06.2016 | ||
LU | 03.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
IE | 03.06.2016 | ||
LU | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
IE | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 07.10.2015 | |
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 07.10.2015 | |
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008225996 (VARE JANI [FI], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0078] *; | [Y] - JOKELA, T.; VESMA, J.; VÄRE J., "L1 signaling parameter definition and signaling transmission in T2", REPLY TO THE CALL FOR TECHNOLOGY, DVB-C2, (20071102), pages 1 - 22, XP002641822 [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [04.1] * | [Y] - Frame structure chanel coding and modulation for a second generation digital terrestrail television broadcasting system (DVB-T2) - DVB document A122- TM 3980 Rev. 5, DVB PROJECT, (20080601), XP002545919 [Y] 1-12 * page 63 - page 64 * * page 75 - page 76 * |