EP2444000 - Ultrasound System for Adjusting Ultrasonic Beam Direction and Method for Operating Ultrasound System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon do 250-875 / KR | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jeong-Sik 106-802, Anheung Jugong Apt. Anheung-dong Icheon 467-712, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Han, Song-yi / 301-702 Byungsan Blumng Apt., Sinwol 4-dong, Yang 158-094, Seoul / KR | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11163082.8 | 19.04.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | KR20100102649 | 20.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100102649 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444000 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/14, G01N29/22, G01N29/44, G01S7/52, G01S15/89 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/14 (EP,US);
A61B8/5215 (EP,US);
G01N29/221 (EP,US);
G01N29/2487 (EP,US);
G01N29/44 (EP,US);
G01S15/8995 (EP,US);
G01S7/52026 (EP,US);
G01S7/52036 (EP,US);
G01S7/52047 (EP,US);
G01S7/5205 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ultraschallsystem zum Einstellen der Ultraschallstrahlenrichtung und Verfahren zum Betrieb des Ultraschallsystems | [2012/17] | English: | Ultrasound System for Adjusting Ultrasonic Beam Direction and Method for Operating Ultrasound System | [2012/17] | French: | Système ultrasonore pour ajuster la direction de faisceau ultrasonique et procédé de fonctionnement du système ultrasonore | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5197475 (ANTICH PETER P [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-3,5-7 * * column 1, line 50 - line 68 * * column 4, line 18 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 5 - column 11, line 55 *; | [A]EP1411370 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]EP1439402 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]EP1890282 (MEDISON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 3-5 ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * |