EP2361629 - Prevention and treatment of synucleinopathic disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Airton Road Tallaght Dublin 24 / IE | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 5th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Airton Road Tallaght Dublin 24 / IE | ||
For all designated states The Regents of The University of California Santa Cruz 1111 Franklin Street, 5th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Airton Road Tallaght Dublin 24 / IE | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Janssen Alzheimer Immunotherapy Little Island Industrial Estate Little Island, County Cork / IE | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607 / US | |||
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schenk, Dale B. 1542 Los Altos Drive Burlingame CA California 94010 / US | 02 /
Masliah, Eliezer 4661 Corte Mar Corazon San Diego CA California 92130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
Schenk, Dale B. 1542 Los Altos Drive Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | ||
02 /
Masliah, Eliezer 4661 Corte Mar Corazon San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11164647.7 | 31.10.2003 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | US20020423012P | 01.11.2002 Original published format: US 423012 P | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361629 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K39/00, A61P25/16 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
A61K39/0007 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K51/1078 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/35] | Title | German: | Prävention und Behandlung von synucleinopathischer Erkrankung | [2011/35] | English: | Prevention and treatment of synucleinopathic disease | [2011/35] | French: | Prévention et traitement d'une maladie synucleopathique | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03783083.3 / EP1578253 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030783083) is 11.10.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 25.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 16   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0072876 (NEURALAB LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 19 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 3; examples 1,2,4,5,7,13,16; sequences 7-11 * * claims 12,18-21 *; | [Y]WO0160794 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 19 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 3; examples 1,2,4,5,7,13,16 * * claims 12,18-21 *; | [A]US2002151464 (WOLOZIN BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs [0032]-[0033] * * page 4, paragraph [0035] - page 5, paragraph [0041]; examples 8,9 * * claims 16-51 *; | [AP]WO03000714 (PANACEA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 6,7 ** page 5, paragraph 14 - page 6, paragraph 20; claims 1,3,9,11,13 *; | [AP]WO03045128 (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al) [AP] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 29, paragraph 45 - page 32, paragraph 49 * * page 38, paragraph 46 - page 39, paragraph 46 * * page 58, paragraph 111 - page 60, paragraph 114 * * page 77, paragraph 114 - page 82, paragraph 153; claims 89-103 *; | [Y] - BARD F ET AL, "Peripherally administered antibodies against amyloid beta- peptide enter the central nervous system and reduce pathology in a mouse model of Alzheimer disease", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000801), vol. 6, no. 8, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 916 - 919, XP002154518 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 174, column R, lines 4-7 * * page 177, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/78682 | [YD] - SCHENK D ET AL, "Immunization with amyloid-beta attenuates Alzheimer -disease-like pathology in the PDAPP mouse [see comments]", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, UK, (19990708), vol. 400, no. 6740, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 173 - 177, XP002154168 [YD] 1-5 * abstract * * page 916, column R, paragraph L - page 917, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/22124 | [A] - HASHIMOTO M ET AL, "[beta]-synuclein inhibits [alpha]-synuclein aggregation: A possible role as an anti-Parkinsonian factor", NEURON 20011025 US, (20011025), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 0896-6273, pages 213 - 223, XP002497157 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 213 * * page 216, column L, paragraph 1 - page 218, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 219, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(01)00462-7 | [A] - WINDISCH M ET AL, "Development of a new treatment for Alzheimer's disease and Parkinson's disease using anti-aggregatory [beta]-synuclein-derived peptides", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE 200208 US, (200208), vol. 19, no. 1-2, ISSN 0895-8696, pages 63 - 69, XP002497158 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 66, column L, paragraph 1 - page 67, column L, paragraph 3; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12031-002-0012-8 | [YD] - MASLIAH ELIEZER ET AL, "beta-Amyloid peptides enhance alpha-synuclein accumulation and neuronal deficits in a transgenic mouse model linking Alzheimer's disease and Parkinson's disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (20011009), vol. 98, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12245 - 12250, XP002201752 [YD] 1-5 * abstract * * page 12245, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 12248, column R, paragraph 3 - page 12250, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.211412398 | [A] - WANKER E E, "Protein aggregation in Huntington's and Parkinson's disease: Implications for therapy", MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY 2000 GB, (2000), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 1357-4310, pages 387 - 391, XP002497160 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 387 * * page 390, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1357-4310(00)01761-5 | [A] - LECERF J-M ET AL, "Human single-chain Fv intrabodies counteract in situ huntingtin aggregation in cellular models of Huntington's disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (20010410), vol. 98, no. 8, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4764 - 4769, XP002323805 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.071058398 | [A] - HEISER V ET AL, "Inhibition of huntingtin fibrillogenesis by specific antibodies and small molecules: Implications for Huntington's disease therapy", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (20000606), vol. 97, no. 12, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6739 - 6744, XP002155981 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6744, column L, line 2 - column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.110138997 | [A] - SIGURDSSON E M ET AL, "Immunization delays the onset of prion disease in mice", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY 2002 US, (200207), vol. 161, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 13 - 17, XP002497161 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 15, column R, paragraph 1 - page 16, column R, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US4634664 | US4634666 | US4666829 | US4855283 | GB2220211 | EP0378881 | WO9007861 | WO9014837 | EP0427347 | WO9110741 | US5057540 | WO9117271 | WO9118980 | WO9201047 | WO9220791 | WO9222653 | WO9301222 | US5196512 | WO9306121 | US5208036 | US5225539 | US5229490 | US5264618 | US5279833 | US5283185 | WO9408051 | US5304489 | WO9412629 | WO9505853 | US5399346 | WO9507707 | WO9512608 | WO9530642 | WO9535503 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634625 | US5585089 | US5593970 | US5612486 | US5625126 | WO9717613 | WO9717614 | US5633425 | US5643576 | US5661016 | US5693762 | US5693761 | US5733743 | US5736142 | US5741957 | WO9823635 | WO9825386 | US5770429 | US5789650 | WO9840100 | US5814318 | US5837242 | US5849992 | WO9859050 | US5858657 | US5871907 | US5874299 | US5877397 | US5877218 | WO0072880 | WO0160794 | - MCKEITH ET AL., "Clinical and pathological diagnosis of dementia with Lewy bodies (DLB): Report of the CDLB International Workshop", NEUROLOGY, (1996), vol. 47, pages 1113 - 24 | - GALASKO ET AL., "Clinical-neuropathological correlations in Alzheimer's disease and related dementias", ARCH. NEUROL., (1994), vol. 51, pages 888 - 95 | - TANNER ET AL., "Epidemiology of Parkinson's disease and akinetic syndromes", CURR. OPIN. NEUROL., (2000), vol. 13, pages 427 - 30 | - SPILLANTINI ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 388, pages 839 - 40 | - TAKEDA ET AL., AM J. PATHOL., (1998), vol. 152, pages 367 - 72 | - WAKABAYASHI ET AL., NEUROSCI. LETT., (1997), vol. 239, pages 45 - 8 | - KRUGER ET AL., NATURE GEN., (1998), vol. 18, pages 106 - 8 | - POLYMEROPOULOS MH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, pages 2045 - 7 | - MASLIAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1265 - 9 | - FEANY ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 394 - 8 | - IWAI A., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2000), vol. 1502, pages 95 - 109 | - MASLIAH ET AL., AM J. PATHOL, (1996), vol. 148, pages 201 - 10 | - UEDA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11282 - 6 | - HASIMOTO ET AL., "Alpha-Synuclein in Lewy body disease and Alzheimer's disease", BRAIN PATHOL, (1999), vol. 9, pages 707 - 20 | - DJALDETTI ET AL., "New therapies for Parkinson's disease", J. NEUROL, (2001), vol. 248, pages 35 7 - 62 | - KIRIK ET AL., "Long-term rAA V-mediated gene transfer of GDNF in the rat Parkinson's model: intrastriatal but not intranigral transduction promotes functional regeneration in the lesioned nigrostriatal system", J. NEUROSCI, (2000), vol. 20, pages 4686 - 4700, XP000972996 | - SCHENK ET AL., "Immunization with amyloid-? attenuates Alzheimer-disease-like pathology in PDAPP mouse", NATURE, (1999), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/22124, pages 173 - 177, XP002154168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/22124 | - MORGAN ET AL., "A-beta peptide vaccination prevents memory loss in an animal model of Alzheimer's disease", NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/35050116, pages 982 - 985, XP002266055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35050116 | - JANUS ET AL., "A-beta peptide immunization reduces behavioral impairment and plaques in a model of Alzheimer's disease", NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/35050110, pages 979 - 82, XP002969677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35050110 | - SMITH, WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF, HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915 | - SONGSIVILAI, LACHMANN, CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321 | - KOSTELNY, J IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - KANG ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 325, page 773 | - PONTE ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 331, page 525 | - KITAGUCHI ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 331, page 530 | - Epitope Mapping Protocols in Methods in Molecular Biology, (1996), vol. 66 | - BURKE ET AL., J. INF. DIS., (1994), vol. 170, pages 1110 - 19 | - TIGGES, J. IMMUNOL., vol. 156, pages 3901 - 3910 | - STAHLI ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1983), vol. 9, pages 242 - 253 | - KIRKLAND ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, pages 3614 - 3619 | - MOREL ET AL., MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 7 - 15 | - CHEUNG ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1990), vol. 176, pages 546 - 552 | - MOLDENHAUER, SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 32, pages 77 - 82 | - UEDA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, no. 23, pages 11282 - 11286 | - IWAI ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 34, pages 10139 - 10145 | - JENSEN ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 31U, pages 91 - 94 | - UéDA ET AL., PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11282 - 11286 | - Essential Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, page 181 | - MASLIAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1265 - 1269 | - VAN DER PUTTER ET AL., J. NEUROSCIENCE, (2000), vol. 20, pages 6025 - 6029 | - GAMES ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, page 523 | - HSIAO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, page 99 | - STAUFENBIEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 13287 - 13292 | - STURCHLER-PIERRAT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 13287 - 13292 | - BORCHELT ET AL., NEURON, (1997), vol. 19, pages 939 - 945 | - M. FLINT BEAL, NATURE REVIEWS NEUROSCIENCE, (2001), vol. 2, pages 325 - 334 | - ARIMA ET AL., BRIAN RES., (1998), vol. 808, pages 93 - 100 | - CROWTHER ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE LETT., (2000), vol. 292, pages 128 - 130 | - SPILLANTINI ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 388, pages 839 - 840 | - H. SHIMURA ET AL., SCIENCE, (20010713), vol. 293, no. 5528, pages 224 - 5 | - CHOTHIA, LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883 | - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033 | - OESTBERG ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1983), vol. 2, pages 361 - 367 | - NATURE, (1994), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 826 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - QUEEN ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1986), vol. 89, page 49 | - CO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, page 1149 | - SINIGAGLIA F. ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 336, pages 778 - 780 | - CHICZ R.M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1993), vol. 178, pages 27 - 47 | - HAMMER J. ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 74, pages 197 - 203 | - FALK K. ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1994), vol. 39, pages 230 - 242 | - SOUTHWOOD S. ET AL., J IMMUNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 160, pages 3363 - 3373 | - ALEXANDER J ET AL., IMMUNIG, (1994), vol. 1, pages 751 - 761 | - IMMUN. REV., (1982), vol. 62, page 185 | - LAWRIE, TUMIN, CUR. OPIN. GENET. DEVELOP., (1993), vol. 3, pages 102 - 109 | - BETT ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, page 5911 | - ZHOU ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, page 1867 | - DUBENSKY ET AL., J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 508 - 519 | - OHE ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 6, pages 325 - 333 | - XIAO, BRANDSMA, NUCLEIC ACIDS. RES., (1996), vol. 24, pages 2630 - 2622 | - GLENNER, WONG, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1984), vol. 120, page 1131 | - HARDY, TINS, (1997), vol. 20, page 154 | - HARDY ET AL., TINS, (1997), vol. 20, pages 155 - 158 | - STOUTE ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 86 - 91 | - CHANG ET AL., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 32, pages 173 - 186 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 1527 | - HANES, ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1997), vol. 28, pages 97 - 119 | - GLENN ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, page 851 | - PAUL ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 25, pages 3521 - 24 | - CEVC ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1368, pages 201 - 15 | - HSUE ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2000), vol. 157, pages 401 - 410 | - IWAI, NEURON, (1995), vol. 14, page 467 | - MASLIAH ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL, (1996), vol. 148, pages 201 - 10 | - MASLIAH ET AL., PNAS USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 12245 - 12250 | US20020423012 |