EP2385520 - Method and device for generating text from spoken word [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foxenland, Eral Västra Rönneholmsvägen, 64 a 217 41, Malmö / SE | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | VALEA AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11164799.6 | 04.05.2011 | [2011/45] | Priority number, date | US20100331937P | 06.05.2010 Original published format: US 331937 P | US20100789734 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: US 789734 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2385520 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2385520 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/26, // G10L15/22 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G10L15/26 (EP,US);
G10L2015/226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Text aus gesprochenen Wörtern | [2011/45] | English: | Method and device for generating text from spoken word | [2011/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de génération textuelle à partir d'un mot prononcé | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 22.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/50] | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6785649 (HOORY RON [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,13,15 [I] 10; | [XI]US6175820 (DIETZ TIMOTHY ALAN [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 10; | [YA]EP1533788 (ARUZE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 7,13 * figures 2,15,16 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0111] , [0113] * [A] 1,2,5,9-12; | [Y]US2008027726 (HANSEN ERIC LOUIS [CA], et al) [Y] 6,15 * abstract * |