EP2520798 - COOLING ARRANGEMENT OF A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/45] | Cooling arrangement of a wind turbine | ||
[2022/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2019/20] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munk-Hansen, Thorkil Sondervang 200 7323, Give / DK | 02 /
Nielsen, Jacob Blach Kastanie alle 37 7442, Engesvang / DK | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Aspacher, Karl-Georg, et al Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/45] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11165132.9 | 06.05.2011 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520798 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2520798 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/60 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
F03D80/60 (EP,US);
F05B2240/14 (EP,US);
F05B2240/916 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y02E10/728 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2012/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLANORDNUNG EINER WINDTURBINE | [2022/09] | English: | COOLING ARRANGEMENT OF A WIND TURBINE | [2022/09] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2022/09] |
Former [2012/45] | Kühlanordnung einer Windturbine | ||
Former [2012/45] | Cooling arrangement of a wind turbine | ||
Former [2012/45] | Agencement de refroidissement d'une éolienne | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 08.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 08.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Observations by third parties | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22177065.4 / EP4092265 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
LT | 08.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1134410 (TACKE WINDENERGIE GMBH [DE]); | [XAI]WO2010085960 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) | Examination | WO2009132671 | WO2012107049 | other | DE102006034299 | WO2009132671 | WO2012107049 |