EP2423327 - Genetic polymorphism associated with liver fibrosis methods of detection and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/09] | Genetic polymorphisms associated with liver fibrosis methods of detection and uses thereof | ||
[2013/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celera Corporation 1401 Harbor Bay Parkway Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cargill, Michele 60 Tarry Lane Orinda, CA 94563 / US | 02 /
Huang, Hongjin 5855 Carmel Way Union City, CA 94587 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | [2012/09] | Application number, filing date | 11165274.9 | 09.05.2005 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | US20040568846P | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 568846 P | US20040599554P | 09.08.2004 Original published format: US 599554 P | US20040582609P | 25.06.2004 Original published format: US 582609 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2423327 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2423327 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2423327 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | Genetischer Polymorphismus und Leberfibrose, Verfahren zur Erkennung und Verwendung davon | [2013/30] | English: | Genetic polymorphism associated with liver fibrosis methods of detection and uses thereof | [2013/30] | French: | Polymorphisme génétique associée à des techniques de detection de cirrhose du foie et utilisation de ces polymorphismes | [2013/30] |
Former [2012/09] | Genetische Polymorphismen und Leberfibrose, Verfahren zur Erkennung und Verwendung davon | ||
Former [2012/09] | Genetic polymorphisms associated with liver fibrosis methods of detection and uses thereof | ||
Former [2012/09] | Polymorphismes génétiques associés à des techniques de detection de cirrhose du foie et utilisation de ces polymorphismes | Examination procedure | 14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05746576.7 / EP1745154 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2005 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | IE | 09.05.2014 | LU | 09.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.05.2005 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003119010 (POWELL ELIZABETH ELLEN [AU], et al) [I] 1-6,10,12,14 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [I]WO03093506 (RENOVO LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-6,10,12,14 * the whole document *; | [X] - BATALLER R. ET AL.,, "genetic polymorphisms and the progression of liver fibrosis: a cirtical appraisal", HEPATOLOGY, (200303), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 493 - 503, XP002357306 [X] 1-6,10,12,14 * see whole doc. esp. Tables 1 and 2, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/jhep.2003.50127 | [X] - BAHR M.J. ET AL.,, "cytokine gene polymorphisms and the susceptibility to liver cirrhosisi in patients with chronic hepatitis C", LIVER INTRENATIONAL, (200312), vol. 23, pages 420 - 425, XP002357307 [X] 1-6,10,12,14 * see whole doc. esp. Tables * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1478-3231.2003.00873.x | [A] - NAMIKAWA CHIKAKO ET AL, "Polymorphisms of microsomal triglyceride transfer protein gene and manganese superoxide dismutase gene in non-alcoholic steatohepatitis", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, (20040501), vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0168-8278, pages 781 - 786, XP002660676 [A] 1-6,10,12,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JHEP.2004.01.028 | by applicant | WO9740462 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US5270184 | US5422252 | US5399491 | US6027923 | US5539082 | US5527675 | US5623049 | US5714331 | US4835263 | US5801115 | EP0235726 | WO8911548 | US4988617 | US4458066 | WO9322456 | US5210015 | US5538848 | US5118801 | US5312728 | US5866336 | US6117635 | US5837832 | WO9511995 | US5807522 | US6124478 | US6107024 | US5994073 | US5981768 | US5871938 | US5843681 | US5800999 | US5773628 | US2002110828 | WO9525116 | US5589136 | US6153073 | US6156181 | US4988167 | US6027889 | US6268148 | US5494810 | US5830711 | US6054564 | WO9731256 | WO0056927 | WO9416101 | US5498531 | US4107288 | US5145684 | US6119096 | US5283317 | WO9410300 | US4816567 | US4816397 | US5693762 | US5585089 | US5565332 | US4946778 | US5637677 | US4736866 | US4870009 | US4873191 | WO9707668 | WO9707669 | - LAUER ET AL., N ENG J MED, (2001), vol. 345, pages 41 - 52 | - POYNARD, LANCET, (1997), vol. 349, pages 825 - 832 | - POYNARD ET AL., LANCET, (1997), vol. 349, pages 825 - 832 | - WRIGHT ET AL., GUT, (2003), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 574 - 9 | - POWELL ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 828 - 33 | - TANAKA ET AL., J. INFEC. DIS., (2003), vol. 187, pages 1822 - 5 | - YAMAUCHI ET AL., J. HEPATOLOGY, (1995), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 519 - 23 | - BERNARD ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (2000), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 995 - 9 | - BATALLER ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2003), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 493 - 503 | - SMITH ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1998), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 1695 - 9 | - THORBURN, GUT, (2002), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 248 - 52 | - GUSELLA, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 55, pages 831 - 854 | - WEBER ET AL., "Human diallelic insertion/deletion polymorphisms", AM J HUM GENET, (200210), vol. 71, no. 4, pages 854 - 62 | - STEPHENS ET AL., SCIENCE, (20010720), vol. 293, pages 489 - 493 | - LINDER ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 43, page 254 | - MARSHALL, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, page 1249 | - SCHAFER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16:3 | - WU, WALLACE, GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, page 560 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 1077 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 | - COREY, "Peptide nucleic acids: expanding the scope of nucleic acid recognition", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (199706), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 224 - 9 | - HYRUP ET AL., "Peptide nucleic acids (PNA): synthesis, properties and potential applications", BIOORG MED CHEM., (199601), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 5 - 23 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), pages 444 - 453 | - DEVEREUX, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387 | - E. MYERS, W. MILLER, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 3389 - 3402 | - PEARSON, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 25, pages 365 - 389 | - DUFRESNE ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (200212), vol. 20, no. 12, pages 1269 - 71 | - SAIKI ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 163 - 166 | - NARANG ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1979), vol. 68, page 90 | - BROWN ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1979), vol. 68, page 109 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, page 1859 | - GIBBS, NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 2427 - 2448 | - LIVAK ET AL., PCR METHOD APPL., (1995), vol. 4, pages 357 - 362 | - TYAGI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 303 - 308 | - NAZARENKO ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 2516 - 2521 | - LOCKHART, D. J. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1680 | - SCHENA, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 10614 - 10619 | - ZAMMATTEO ET AL., "New chips for molecular biology and diagnostics", BIOTECHNOL ANNU REV., (2002), vol. 8, pages 85 - 101 | - SOSNOWSKI ET AL., "Active microelectronic array system for DNA hybridization, genotyping and pharmacogenomic applications", PSYCHIATR GENET., (200212), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 181 - 92 | - HELLER, "DNA microarray technology: devices, systems, and applications", ANNU REV BIOMED ENG., (2002), vol. 4, pages 129 - 53 | - KOLCHINSKY ET AL., "Analysis of SNPs and other genomic variations using gel-based chips", HUM MUTAT., (200204), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 343 - 60 | - MCGALL ET AL., "High-density genechip oligonucleotide probe arrays", ADV BIOCHEM ENG BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 77, pages 21 - 42 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6 | - WEIGL ET AL., "Lab-on-a-chip for drug development", ADV DRUG DELIV REV, (20030224), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 349 - 77 | - CHEN ET AL., "Single nucleotide polymorphism genotyping: biochemistry, protocol, cost and throughput", PHARMACOGENOMICS,J., (2003), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 77 - 96 | - KWOK ET AL., "Detection of single nucleotide polymorphisms", CURR ISSUES MOL BIOL., (200304), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 43 - 60 | - SHI, "Technologies for individual genotyping: detection of genetic polymorphisms in drug targets and disease genes", AM J PHARMACOGENOMICS., (2002), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 197 - 205 | - KWOK, "Methods for genotyping single nucleotide polymorphisms", ANNU REV GENOMICS HUM GENET, (2001), vol. 2, pages 235 - 58 | - MARNELLOS, "High-throughput SNP analysis for genetic association studies", CURR OPIN DRUG DISCOV DEVEL., (200305), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 317 - 21 | - MYERS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, page 1242 | - COTTON ET AL., PNAS, (1988), vol. 85, page 4397 | - SALEEBA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1992), vol. 217, pages 286 - 295 | - ORITA ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, page 2766 | - COTTON ET AL., MUTAT. RES., (1993), vol. 285, pages 125 - 144 | - HAYASHI ET AL., GENET. ANAL. TECH. APPL., (1992), vol. 9, pages 73 - 79 | - MYERS ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, page 495 | - WISE ET AL., "A standard protocol for single nucleotide primer extension in the human genome using matrix-assisted laser desorption/ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", RAPID COMMUN MASS SPECTROM., (2003), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 1195 - 202 | - BOCKER, "SNP and mutation discovery using base-specific cleavage and MALDI-TOF mass spectrometry", BIOINFORMATICS, (200307), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 144 - 153 | - STORM ET AL., "MALDI-TOF mass spectrometry-based SNP genotyping", METHODS MOL BIOL., (2003), vol. 212, pages 241 - 62 | - JURINKE ET AL., "The use of Mass ARRAY technology for high throughput genotyping", ADV BIOCHEM ENG BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 77, pages 57 - 74 | - JURINKE ET AL., "Automated genotyping using the DNA MassArray technology", METHODS MOL BIOL., (2002), vol. 187, pages 179 - 92 | - BIOTECLINIQUES, (1995), vol. 19, page 448 | - COHEN ET AL., ADV. CHROMATOGR., (1996), vol. 36, pages 127 - 162 | - GRIFFIN ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 38, pages 147 - 159 | - ORITA ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD | - Modem Epidemiology, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, (1998), pages 609 - 622 | - DALY ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (2001), vol. 29, pages 232 - 235 | - SCHAID ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (2002), vol. 70, pages 425 - 434 | - BENJAMINI, HOCHBERG, JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY, SERIES B, (1995), vol. 57, pages 1289 - 1300 | - Modern Epidemiology, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, (1998), pages 643 - 673 | - EWENS, SPIELMAN, AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1995), vol. 62, pages 450 - 458 | - PRITCHARD ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GEN., (1999), vol. 65, pages 220 - 228 | - DEVLIN ET AL., BIOMETRICS, (1999), vol. 55, pages 997 - 1004 | - DEVLIN ET AL., GENET. EPIDEM., vol. 20001, no. 21, pages 273 - 284 | - BACANU ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (2000), vol. 66, pages 1933 - 1944 | - KEHOE ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1999), vol. 8, pages 237 - 245 | - WALL ET AL., "Haplotype blocks and linkage disequilibrium in the human genome", NAT REV GENET., (200308), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 587 - 97 | - GARNER ET AL., "On selecting markers for association studies: patterns of linkage disequilibrium between two and three diallelic loci", GENET EPIDEMIOL., (200301), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 57 - 67 | - ARDLIE ET AL., "Patterns of linkage disequilibrium in the human .genome", NAT REV GENET., (200204), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 299 - 309 | - NAT REV GENET, (200207), vol. 3, no. 7, page 566 | - REMM ET AL., "High-density genotyping and linkage disequilibrium in the human genome using chromosome 22 as a model", CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (200202), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 24 - 30 | - ROSES, NATURE, (2000), vol. 405, pages 857 - 865 | - GOULD ROTHBERG, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 19, pages 209 - 211 | - EICHELBAUM, CLIN. EXP. PHARMACOL. PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 23, no. 10-11, pages 983 - 985 | - LINDER, CLIN. CHEM., (1997), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 254 - 266 | - ROSE ET AL., "Pharmacogenetic analysis of clinically relevant genetic polymorphisms", METHODS MOL MED., (2003), vol. 85, pages 225 - 37 | - CACABELOS, "Pharmacogenomics for the treatment of dementia", ANN MED., (2002), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 357 - 79 | - MAIMONE ET AL., "Pharmacogenomics of neurodegenerative diseases", EUR J PHARMACOL., (20010209), vol. 413, no. 1, pages 11 - 29 | - POIRIER, "Apolipoprotein E: a pharmacogenetic target for the treatment of Alzheimer's disease", MOL DIAGN., (199912), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 335 - 41 | - SIEST ET AL., "Pharmacogenomics of drugs affecting the cardiovascular system", CLIN CHEM LAB MED., (200304), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 590 - 9 | - MUKHERJEE ET AL., "Pharmacogenomics in cardiovascular diseases", PROG CARDIOVASC DIS., (200205), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 479 - 98 | - MOOSER ET AL., "Cardiovascular pharmacogenetics in the SNP era", J THROMB HAEMOST, (200307), vol. 1, no. 7, pages 1398 - 402 | - MCLEOD ET AL., "Cancer pharmacogenomics: SNPs, chips, and the individual patient", CANCER INVEST, (2003), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 630 - 40 | - WATTERS ET AL., "Cancer pharmacogenomics: current and future applications", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (20030317), vol. 1603, no. 2, pages 99 - 111 | - THOMPSON, DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2002), vol. 7, no. 17, pages 912 - 917 | - LAVERY ET AL., "Antisense and RNAi: powerful tools in drug target discovery and validation", CURR OPIN DRUG DISCOV DEVEL., (200307), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 561 - 9 | - STEPHENS ET AL., "Antisense oligonucleotide therapy in cancer", CURR OPIN MOL THER., (200304), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 118 - 22 | - KURRECK, "Antisense technologies., Improvement through novel chemical modifications", EUR J BIOCHEM., (200304), vol. 270, no. 8 | - DIAS ET AL., "Antisense oligonucleotides: basic concepts and mechanisms", MOL. CANCER THER., (200203), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 347 - 55 | - CHEN, "Clinical development of antisense oligonucleotides as anti-cancer therapeutics", METHODS MOL MED., (2003), vol. 75, pages 621 - 36 | - WANG, "Antisense anticancer oligonucleotide therapeutics", CURR CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (200111), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 177 - 96 | - BENNETT, "Efficiency of antisense oligonucleotide drug discovery", ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (200206), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 215 - 24 | - REYNOLDS, "Rational siRNA design for RNA interference", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200403), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 326 - 30 | - CHI ET AL., "Genomewide view of gene silencing by small interfering RNAs", PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, no. 11, pages 6343 - 6346 | - VICKERS ET AL., "Efficient Reduction of Target RNAs by Small Interfering RNA and RNase H-dependent Antisense Agents", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 7108 - 7118 | - AGAMI, "RNAi and related mechanisms and their potential use for therapy", CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (200212), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 829 - 34 | - SHI, "Mammalian RNAi for the masses", TRENDS GENET, (200301), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 9 - 12 | - SHUEY ET AL., "RNAi: gene-silencing in therapeutic intervention", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (200210), vol. 7, no. 20, pages 1040 - 1046 | - MCMANUS ET AL., NAT REV GENET, (200210), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 737 - 47 | - XIA ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (200210), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 1006 - 10 | - PLASTERK ET AL., CURR OPIN GENET DEV, (200010), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 562 - 7 | - BOSHER ET AL., NATCELL BIOL, (200002), vol. 2, no. 2, pages E31 - 6 | - HUNTER, CURR BIOL, (19990617), vol. 9, no. 12, pages R440 - 2 | - KREN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 10349 - 10354 | - JAZWINSKA, A TRENDS GUIDE TO GENETIC VARIATION AND GENOMIC MEDICINE, (200203), pages S30 - S36 | - ROTHBERG, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (200103), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 209 - 11 | - GILL, "An assessment of the utility of single nucleotide polymorphisms (SNPs) for forensic purposes", INT J LEGAL MED., (2001), vol. 114, no. 4-5, pages 204 - 10 | - FRUDAKIS ET AL., "A Classifier for the SNP-Based Inference of Ancestry", JOURNAL OF FORENSIC SCIENCES, (2003), vol. 48, pages 771 - 782 | - KRAWCZAK, "Informativity assessment for biallelic single nucleotide polymorphisms", ELECTROPHORESIS, (199906), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 1676 - 81 | - TERPE, "Overview of tag protein fusions: from molecular and biochemical fundamentals to commercial systems", APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECLZNOL., (200301), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 523 - 33 | - GRADDIS ET AL., "Designing proteins that work using recombinant technologies", CURR PHAIM BIOTECHNOL., (200212), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 285 - 97 | - NILSSON ET AL., "Affinity fusion strategies for detection, purification, and immobilization of recombinant proteins", PROTEIN EXPR PUTIF., (199710), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 1 - 16 | - BOWIE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247 | - CUNNINGHAM, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - SMITH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - DE VOS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - WOLD, F., Posttranslational Covalent Modification of Proteins, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), pages 1 - 12 | - SEIFTER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - RATTAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 663, pages 48 - 62 | - HAGE, "Immunoassays", ANAL CHEM., (19990615), vol. 71, no. 12, pages 294R - 304R | - LAM ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84 | - HOUGHTEN ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 84 - 86 | - SONGYANG ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 767 - 778 | - HODGSON, BIO / TECHNOLOGY, (19920910), no. 9, pages 973 - 80 | - ZERVOS ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 223 - 232 | - MADURA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 12046 - 12054 | - BARTEL ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1993), vol. 14, pages 920 - 924 | - IWABUCHI ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1993), vol. 8, pages 1693 - 1696 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6851 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, page 604 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, page 544 | - SEGAL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, page 1 | - CARTER, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, page 7 | - TODOROVSKA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, page 47 | - KOHLER, MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - HE, J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 169, page 595 | - HOOGENBOOM, CHAMES, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, page 371 | - LIU ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 315, page 1063 | - MORGAN, "Antibody therapy for Alzheimer's disease", EXPERT REV VACCINES., (200302), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 53 - 9 | - ROSS ET AL., "Anticancer antibodies", AM J CLIN PATHOL., (200304), vol. 119, no. 4, pages 472 - 85 | - GOLDENBERG, "Advancing role of radiolabeled antibodies in the therapy of cancer", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (20030311), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 281 - 96 | - ROSS ET AL., "Antibody-based therapeutics in oncology", EXPERT REV ANTICANCER THER., (200302), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 107 - 21 | - CAO ET AL., "Bispecific antibody conjugates in therapeutics", ADV DRUG DELIV REV., (20030210), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 171 - 97 | - VON MEHREN ET AL., "Monoclonal antibody therapy for cancer", ANNU REV MED., (20011203), vol. 54, pages 343 - 69 | - HUDSON ET AL., "Engineered antibodies", NAT MED., (200301), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 129 - 34 | - BREKKE ET AL., "Tberapeutic antibodies for human diseases at the dawn of the twenty-first century", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (200301), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 52 - 62 | - ERRATUM, NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (200303), vol. 2, no. 3, page 240 | - HOUDEBINE, "Antibody manufacture in transgenic animals and comparisons with other systems", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL., (200212), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 625 - 9 | - ANDREAKOS ET AL., "Monoclonal antibodies in immune and inflammatory diseases", CURR OPINBIOTECHNOL., (200212), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 615 - 20 | - KELLERMANN ET AL., "Antibody, discovery: the use of transgenic mice to generate human monoclonal antibodies for therapeutics", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL., (200212), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 593 - 7 | - PINI ET AL., "Phage display and colony filter screening for high-throughput selection of antibody libraries", COMB CHEM HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREEN., (200211), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 503 - 10 | - BATRA ET AL., "Pharmacokinetics and biodistribution of genetically engineered antibodies", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL., (200212), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 603 - 8 | - TANGRI ET AL., "Rationally engineered proteins or antibodies with absent or reduced immunogenicity", CURR MED CHEM., (200212), vol. 9, no. 24, pages 2191 - 9 | - LEONG ET AL., CYTOKINE, (2001), vol. 16, page 106 | - SMITH ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40 | - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315 | - STUDIER ET AL., GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89 | - GOTTESMAN, S., Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 119 - 128 | - WADA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 2111 - 2118 | - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234 | - KURJAN ET AL., CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 933 - 943 | - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123 | - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL, (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165 | - LUCKLOW ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39 | - SEED, B, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 187 - 195 | - LAKSO ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6236 | - O'GORMAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 1351 - 1355 | - WILMUT, I. ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 385, pages 810 - 813 | - PETTERS, "Transgenic animals as models for human disease", TRANSGENIC RES., (2000), vol. 9, no. 4-5, pages 347 - 51 | - WOLF ET AL., "Use of transgenic animals in understanding molecular mechanisms of toxicity", J PHARM PHARMACOL., (199806), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 567 - 74 | - ECHELARD, "Recombinant protein production in transgenic animals", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL., (199610), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 536 - 40 | - HOUDEBINE, "Transgenic animal bioreactors", TRANSGENIC. RES., (2000), vol. 9, no. 4-5, pages 305 - 20 | - PIRITY ET AL., "Embryonic stem cells, creating transgenic animals", METHODS CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 57, pages 279 - 93 | - ROBL ET AL., "Artificial chromosome vectors and expression of complex proteins in transgenic animals", THERIOGENOLOGY, (20030101), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 107 - 13 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - BRUTLAG ET AL., COMP. CHEM., (1993), vol. 17, pages 203 - 207 | - BATTS ET AL., AM J. SURG. PATHOL., (1995), vol. 19, pages 1409 - 1417 | - BRUNT, HEPATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 31, pages 241 - 246 | - GERMER ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 10, pages 258 - 266 | - KNODELL ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1981), vol. 1, pages 431 - 435 | - GERMER S., HOLLAND M.J., HIGUCHI R., GENOME RES., (2000), vol. 10, pages 258 - 266 | - GOH ET AL., J VIROL., (2004), vol. 78, pages 5288 - 98 | US20030620332 | US20030620333 | WO2001US17329 | US20020427818 | US20030445636 | US20030445494 |